Global Patent Index - EP 1315766 A1

EP 1315766 A1 2003-06-04 - NOVOLAK RESINS, METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME AND USES THEREOF

Title (en)

NOVOLAK RESINS, METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME AND USES THEREOF

Title (de)

NOVOLAKHARZE, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

RESINES NOVOLAQUES, LEUR PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ET LEURS UTILISATIONS

Publication

EP 1315766 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01967458 A

Priority

  • FR 0102791 W
  • FR 0011471 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0220636A1] The invention concerns novel novolak resins obtained by condensation of at least an aromatic compound (A) comprising at least two hydroxyl groups and at least an aldehyde (B) in the presence of an acid catalyst and in the presence of water and/or an organic solvent, followed by a step consisting in alkylating the resulting condensation resin with at least a non-conjugated diene (C) preferably not containing indene. Said novolak resins are advantageously used in vulcanized and crosslinked elastomeric compositions insofar as their viscosity lower than that of prior art resins enables them to be easily manipulated. They are also used as dipping agents to improve the adherence of rubber on reinforcing materials such as organic fibres in particular based on rayon, polyesters, polyamides or aramides and metal cables based on steel, in particular brass-plated or zinc-plated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08G 8/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08K 3/06 (2006.01); C08G 8/28 (2006.01); C08G 8/30 (2006.01); C08K 3/36 (2006.01); C08L 21/00 (2006.01); C09J 121/00 (2006.01); C09J 161/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08G 8/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0220636A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0220636 A1 20020314; AU 8783501 A 20020322; EP 1315766 A1 20030604; FR 2813886 A1 20020315; FR 2813886 B1 20050415; JP 2004511584 A 20040415; KR 20030033051 A 20030426; SK 2852003 A3 20030701; US 2004059039 A1 20040325; US 7135539 B2 20061114

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-14 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070104

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050121

2006-05-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHENECTADY INTERNATIONAL, INC.

2005-03-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050121

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030215

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI