Global Patent Index - EP 1315789 A1

EP 1315789 A1 2003-06-04 - USE OF GRAFTED POLYALKYLENE OXIDES AS GREYING INHIBITORS WHEN WASHING

Title (en)

USE OF GRAFTED POLYALKYLENE OXIDES AS GREYING INHIBITORS WHEN WASHING

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON GEPFROPFTEN POLYALKYLENOXIDEN ALS VERGRAUUNGSINHIBITOREN BEIM WASCHEN

Title (fr)

UTILISATION D'OXYDES DE POLYALKYLENE GREFFES EN TANT QUE SUBSTANCES EMPECHANT LES MATIERES TEXTILES DE GRISAILLER LORS DU LAVAGE

Publication

EP 1315789 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01962983 A

Priority

  • DE 10042815 A
  • EP 0110000 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0218526A1] The invention relates to the use of grafted polymers as greying inhibitors during the washing and aftertreatment of textile goods. Said polymers are obtained by polymerising A) 10 to 95 wt. % of grafted monomers containing, in relation to A), a) 1 to 99 wt. % of at least one vinyl ester, b) 1 to 99 wt. % of at least one N-vinyl lactam, c) 0 to 90 wt. % of at least one other monoethylenically unsaturated monomer which can be copolymerised with monomers a) and b), and d) 0 to 5 wt. % of at least one monomer having at least two ethylenically unsaturated, non-conjugated double bonds in the molecule, in the presence of A) 5 to 90 wt. % of at least one polymer B), chosen from polyalkylene oxides containing at least 3 units of a C2 to C4 alkylene oxide, and polytetrahydrofuranes containing at least 3 units of tetramethyl oxide units, and the mixtures thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/37; C08F 283/06; C08L 51/08; C11D 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06L 1/12 (2006.01); C08F 283/06 (2006.01); C08L 51/08 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3788 (2013.01); C08F 283/06 (2013.01); C08L 51/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0218526A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0218526 A1 20020307; AU 8404301 A 20020313; CA 2420938 A1 20030227; DE 10042815 A1 20020314; EP 1315789 A1 20030604; JP 2004507610 A 20040311; MX PA03001264 A 20030624; US 2003186833 A1 20031002; US 6946004 B2 20050920

INPADOC legal status


2014-12-10 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140201

2008-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASF SE

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040402

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI