Global Patent Index - EP 1315861 A1

EP 1315861 A1 2003-06-04 - GROOVED LEAD BLADE FOR A PAPERMAKING MACHINE

Title (en)

GROOVED LEAD BLADE FOR A PAPERMAKING MACHINE

Title (de)

GERILLTE LEITSCHAUFEL FÜR EINE PAPIERMASCHINE

Title (fr)

LAME DE CINTRAGE RAINUREE

Publication

EP 1315861 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01973866 A

Priority

  • CA 0101260 W
  • GB 0021767 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0220899A1] A vented lead blade (5) for use in a paper making machine located so that the stock jet (9) impinges the forming fabric (3) at, or near to, its trailing edge (14). The vented lead blade serves to bend the forming fabric before it enters the forming section, and to vent at least a substantial proportion of any air (8) which becomes trapped in the wedge shaped space between the surface of the forming fabric and the surface of the stock jet, together with at least some of any liquid carried with the air. The vented lead blade of this invention thus enables the forming fabric to be positioned so that the angle of impingement of the stock jet onto the forming fabric can be minimized to become substantially zero. It also makes it possible to reduce the unsupported length of the stock jet. The vented lead blade of this invention can be used in both an open surface forming section with one forming fabric, or in the forming section of a two fabric paper making machine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 9/00; D21F 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/48 (2006.01); D21F 9/00 (2006.01); D21F 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/02 (2013.01); D21F 1/483 (2013.01); D21F 9/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0220899A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0220899 A1 20020314; AU 9353201 A 20020322; CA 2356804 A1 20020305; CA 2356804 C 20080311; DE 60124739 D1 20070104; DE 60124739 T2 20070301; EP 1315861 A1 20030604; EP 1315861 B1 20061122; GB 0021767 D0 20001018; US 2002046821 A1 20020425

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170401

2017-04-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160905

2017-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60124739

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-10-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150907

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070823

2007-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60124739 P 20070104

2006-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI

2006-08-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASTENJOHNSON, INC.

2006-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BUCHANAN, JOHN G.

2006-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PITT, RICHARD E.

2006-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VAN ESSEN, ROY

2006-05-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FI

2005-08-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050621

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FI

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI