Global Patent Index - EP 1315892 A1

EP 1315892 A1 2003-06-04 - MIXTURE ADAPTATION METHOD

Title (en)

MIXTURE ADAPTATION METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR GEMISCHADAPTION

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'ADAPTATION DU MELANGE

Publication

EP 1315892 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01962669 A

Priority

  • DE 0103227 W
  • DE 10043256 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0218766A1] The invention relates to a method for compensating for incorrect adaptations of the pilot control of a fuel metering for an internal combustion engine. According to the invention, a control is superimposed by a pilot control. In addition, at least one correcting quantity is derived from the behavior of the control at high temperatures of the internal combustion engine. In order to compensate for the incorrect adaptations, said correcting quantity influences the fuel metering also at low temperatures of the internal combustion engine in a manner that is complementary to the superimposed control. At low temperatures, another correcting quantity is formed, which acts upon the fuel metering, and whose action is greater at low temperatures of the internal combustion engine than at high temperatures.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/14; F02D 41/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/06 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01); F02D 41/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/06 (2013.01); F02D 41/14 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0606 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0218766A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0218766 A1 20020307; DE 10043256 A1 20020314; DE 50110277 D1 20060803; EP 1315892 A1 20030604; EP 1315892 B1 20060621; ES 2266239 T3 20070301; JP 2004507655 A 20040311; JP 4773675 B2 20110914; US 2004035405 A1 20040226; US 6883510 B2 20050426

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170830

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170901

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170823

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070322

2007-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2266239 T3

2006-12-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50110277 P 20060803

2006-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR SE

2006-06-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WAGNER, JENS

2006-06-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KALTENBRUNN, PETER

2006-06-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ESTEGHLAL, GHOLAMABAS

2006-06-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HIRSCHMANN, KLAUS

2005-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050607

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR SE

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI