Global Patent Index - EP 1315893 A1

EP 1315893 A1 2003-06-04 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE AMOUNT OF FUEL INJECTED IN A DIRECT INJECTION INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE AMOUNT OF FUEL INJECTED IN A DIRECT INJECTION INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER EINGESPRITZTEN KRAFTSTOFFMENGE IN EINE DIREKTEINSPRITZBRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE LA QUANTITE DE CARBURANT INJECTE DANS UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE A INJECTION DIRECTE

Publication

EP 1315893 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01969575 A

Priority

  • EP 0109120 W
  • FR 0011237 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0220968A1] The invention concerns a method which consists in using an injector supplied with fuel whereof the pressure (Pcarb) is an increasing function of the amount of fuel (Q) to be injected, the opening of the injector being electromagnetically triggered by energizing the electric coil integral with the injector with a current peak of predetermined duration (T1). The invention is characterised in that the duration (T1) of the current peak in an increasing function of the pressure (Pcarb) of the fuel. Thus, the dynamics of the injector is increased.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/20; F02D 41/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/20 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/3809 (2013.01); F02D 41/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0220968A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0220968 A1 20020314; DE 60102708 D1 20040513; DE 60102708 T2 20041021; EP 1315893 A1 20030604; EP 1315893 B1 20040407; ES 2218449 T3 20041116; FR 2813642 A1 20020308; FR 2813642 B1 20021220; JP 2004514082 A 20040513; JP 4478385 B2 20100609; KR 100763052 B1 20071002; KR 20030036743 A 20030509; US 2003188717 A1 20031009; US 6755181 B2 20040629

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080808

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080807

2009-10-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080808

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080807

2009-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080807

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070829

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070808

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-09-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070917

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-10-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061023

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-03-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050110

2004-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2218449 T3

2004-09-29 [REG GB ERR] ERRATUM

- Free text: NOTIFICATION HAS NOW BEEN RECEIVED FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE THAT THE CORRECT NAME OF THE APPLICANT/PROPRIETOR IS: SIEMENS VDO AUTOMOTIVE S.A.S. THIS CORRECTION WILL BE PUBLISHED IN THE EUROPEAN PATENT BULLETIN 04/20 DATED 20040512

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-05-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60102708 P 20040513

2004-05-12 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS VDO AUTOMOTIVE S.A.S.

2004-04-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2004-04-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030127

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR