Global Patent Index - EP 1315895 A1

EP 1315895 A1 2003-06-04 - METHOD FOR ADAPTING MIXTURE CONTROL IN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES WITH DIRECT FUEL INJECTION

Title (en)

METHOD FOR ADAPTING MIXTURE CONTROL IN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES WITH DIRECT FUEL INJECTION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR GEMISCHADAPTION BEI VERBRENNUNGSMOTOREN MIT BENZINDIREKTEINSPRITZUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'ADAPTATION DE MELANGE DANS DES MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE AVEC INJECTION DIRECTE D'ESSENCE

Publication

EP 1315895 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01971658 A

Priority

  • DE 0103290 W
  • DE 10043072 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0218768A1] The invention relates to a method for compensating for incorrect adaptations of the precontrol of the fuel metering of an internal combustion engine that is operated in at least two operating modes, namely homogeneous normal operation and stratified charge operation. The inventive method is further characterized in that mixture control and adaptation of said mixture control takes place in the homogeneous normal operation. Depending on a desired operation, the control switches between the two operating modes, said desired operation being determined by a plurality of operating mode requirements, a priority being allocated to every operating mode requirement. The desired operation is determined depending on the priorities of the operating mode requirements. The physical urgency of the adaptation is increased by different intervals, thereby requiring a switch to the homogeneous operation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/26; F02D 41/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/08 (2006.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 41/22 (2006.01); F02D 41/26 (2006.01); F02D 41/30 (2006.01); F02D 43/00 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/22 (2013.01); F02D 41/2441 (2013.01); F02D 41/2454 (2013.01); F02D 41/26 (2013.01); F02D 41/263 (2013.01); F02D 41/3076 (2013.01); F02D 41/003 (2013.01); F02D 41/2448 (2013.01); F02D 41/2467 (2013.01); F02D 41/3029 (2013.01); F02D 2041/389 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0218768A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0218768 A1 20020307; CN 1388859 A 20030101; DE 10043072 A1 20020314; DE 50108917 D1 20060420; EP 1315895 A1 20030604; EP 1315895 B1 20060208; ES 2256295 T3 20060716; JP 2004507657 A 20040311; US 2003101963 A1 20030605; US 6655346 B2 20031202

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-05-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50108917

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-03-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50108917

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131025

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-10-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111019

2011-08-11 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50108917

- Effective date: 20110621

2011-08-11 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50108917

- Effective date: 20110614

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090821

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090819

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061109

2006-09-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2256295 T3

2006-05-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060508

2006-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50108917 P 20060420

2006-02-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR SE

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020916

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR SE