Global Patent Index - EP 1315897 A1

EP 1315897 A1 2003-06-04 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE INJECTION TIME OF THE INJECTION SYSTEM OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE INJECTION TIME OF THE INJECTION SYSTEM OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR FESTLEGUNG DES EINSPRITZZEITPUNKTES BEI EINER EINSPRITZANLAGE FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR FIXER LE POINT D'INJECTION DANS LE SYSTEME D'INJECTION D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1315897 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01982101 A

Priority

  • DE 0103355 W
  • DE 10043756 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0223031A1] The invention relates to a method for determining the injection time of the injection system of an internal combustion engine, comprising the following steps: detecting a crankshaft signal that indicates the relative position of the crankshaft, determining the injection time on the basis of said crankshaft signal, detecting the phase angle of the crankshaft, synchronizing the calculated injection time on the basis of the phase position of the crankshaft, said phase position of the crankshaft being determined on the basis of the crankshaft signal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/34; F02D 41/06; F02D 41/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 41/22 (2006.01); F02D 41/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/009 (2013.01); F02D 41/1498 (2013.01); F02D 41/222 (2013.01); F02D 2200/1015 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0223031A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0223031 A1 20020321; DE 10043756 A1 20020328; DE 10043756 C2 20021128; EP 1315897 A1 20030604; EP 1315897 B1 20041124; JP 2004509267 A 20040325; US 2003196643 A1 20031023; US 6868833 B2 20050322

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090903

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090903

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090903

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080918

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080912

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080922

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050825

2005-10-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050214

2004-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50104628 P 20041230

2004-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-11-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030304

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR