Global Patent Index - EP 1315900 A1

EP 1315900 A1 2003-06-04 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (de)

BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1315900 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01964937 A

Priority

  • DE 0103266 W
  • DE 10043085 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0218776A1] Ein Brennstoffeinspritzventil (1), insbesondere ein Brennstoffeinspritzventil für Brennstoffeinspritzanlagen von Brennkraftmaschinen, umfasst eine Ventilnadel (3), deren Ventilschliesskörper (4) mit einer Ventilsitzfläche (6) zu einem Dichtsitz zusammenwirkt, und einen an der Ventilnadel (3) angreifenden Anker (20), wobei der Anker (20) an der Ventilnadel (2) axial beweglich angeordnet ist und von einem aus einem Elastomer bestehenden Dämpfungselement (32) gedämpft wird. Zwischen dem Dämpfungselement (32) und der Ventilnadel (3) ist ein Ringraum (37) ausgebildet, welcher mit Brennstoff gefüllt ist, wobei der Ringraum (37) mit einem Drosselspalt (39), in Verbindung steht.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 51/06; F02M 61/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/0685 (2013.01); F02M 61/165 (2013.01); F02M 2200/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0218776A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0218776 A1 20020307; CN 1255627 C 20060510; CN 1388862 A 20030101; CZ 20021505 A3 20031015; DE 10043085 A1 20020314; DE 50109710 D1 20060608; EP 1315900 A1 20030604; EP 1315900 B1 20060503; JP 2004507661 A 20040311; US 2003146400 A1 20030807; US 6745993 B2 20040608

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070825

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060825

2007-06-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060825

2007-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070206

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-11-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-09-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060824

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50109710 P 20060608

2006-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-05-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-06-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050518

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MUELLER, MARTIN

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR