Global Patent Index - EP 1315903 A1

EP 1315903 A1 2003-06-04 - STARTER DEVICE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

STARTER DEVICE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

STARTVORRICHTUNG FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE DEMARRAGE POUR DES MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1315903 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01960110 A

Priority

  • DE 0102515 W
  • DE 10041999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0218780A1] The invention relates to a starter device for internal combustion engines. Said device comprises a starter motor (11), whose starter pinion meshes with the ring gear of an internal combustion engine by means of a solenoid switch (19) and also activates the starter motor towards the end of its travel using a switching contact (24). The solenoid switch (19) is also provided with a pull-in winding (22) and a hold-in winding (23). To prevent chatter or oscillation of the switching contact (24), caused in particular by a wobble or oscillation of the switch armature when the meshing spring (21) is tensioned as a result of a tooth-on-tooth position during the meshing operation, the replete pull-in force of the solenoid switch (19) is prolonged after the closing of the switching contact (24) by a timing element (29), whilst the pull-in winding (22) is connected in series to a control switch (28), which is reversed by means of the timing element (29) that is connected in parallel to the starter motor (11), from a conductive state to an off-state.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02N 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/087 (2013.01); F02N 15/067 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0218780A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0218780 A1 20020307; DE 10041999 A1 20020307; EP 1315903 A1 20030604; EP 1315903 B1 20040303; ES 2217178 T3 20041101

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180201

2018-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50101638

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160927

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130706

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120803

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120721

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070707

2008-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070707

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070706

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070706

2006-07-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060724

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-07-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060721

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-12-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2217178 T3

2004-10-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-08-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-07-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040629

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50101638 P 20040408

2004-04-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI