Global Patent Index - EP 1315933 A1

EP 1315933 A1 2003-06-04 - COMBUSTIBLE GAS DISTRIBUTION APPARATUS

Title (en)

COMBUSTIBLE GAS DISTRIBUTION APPARATUS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERSORGUNG VON BRENNBAREM GAS

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE DISTRIBUTION DE GAZ COMBUSTIBLE

Publication

EP 1315933 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00964607 A

Priority

IT 0000348 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0218837A1] A combustible gas distribution apparatus, suitable for using a plurality of cartridges (C) filled with combustible gas, has a container suitable for receiving the cartridges (C), a plurality of couplings (11) to each of which a respective cartridge (C) is adapted to be connected, a manifold unit (12, 13) connected to the couplings (11) and which by way of a valve conveys the gases of the cartridges (C) towards an outlet of the apparatus. The container is formed of a hollow body (2) and a base (3) which closes the hollow body (2); in the hollow body (2) are fixed the couplings (11), the manifold unit (12, 13) and the valve; the base (3) can be opened for the insertion of the cartridges (C) into the container. Said distribution apparatus is structurally simple, economical in construction, and permits easy installation and removal of the cartridges.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F17C 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F17C 13/00 (2006.01); F17C 13/08 (2006.01); F23D 14/28 (2006.01); F23K 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F17C 13/084 (2013.01); F17C 2201/0109 (2013.01); F17C 2201/0114 (2013.01); F17C 2201/032 (2013.01); F17C 2201/058 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0107 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0111 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0165 (2013.01); F17C 2205/018 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0329 (2013.01); F17C 2205/037 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0385 (2013.01); F17C 2270/07 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0218837A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0218837 A1 20020307; AT 284506 T 20041215; AU 2000275529 B2 20070201; AU 7552900 A 20020313; CN 1243924 C 20060301; CN 1454304 A 20031105; DE 60016636 D1 20050113; DE 60016636 T2 20051124; DK 1315933 T3 20050418; EP 1315933 A1 20030604; EP 1315933 B1 20041208; ES 2234666 T3 20050701; JP 2004507697 A 20040311; PT 1315933 E 20050531; SI EP1315933 T1 20050430

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160803

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2009-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20070720

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-10-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2009-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2009-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-06-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20090420

2009-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090304

2009-06-24 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2009-06-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-05-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090301

2009-05-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2009-05-06 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090301

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2009-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080831

2009-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2009-03-30 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2009-03-11 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2008-05-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20070730

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070831

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070817

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070716

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070726

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070717

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070710

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-24 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20070807

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-07-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070723

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-07-20 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20070720

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-07-19 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20070719

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-07-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070718

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-07-18 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20070718

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-07-13 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070713

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060815

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-12-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050909

2005-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2234666 T3

2005-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20050308

2005-04-20 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050400751

2005-04-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: JACOBACCI & PARTNERS S.P.A.

2005-03-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-01-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60016636 P 20050113

2005-01-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: RO SI

2004-12-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031006

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030127

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI