Global Patent Index - EP 1315936 A1

EP 1315936 A1 2003-06-04 - GRATE BAR WITH LIQUID COOLING FOR INCINERATORS

Title (en)

GRATE BAR WITH LIQUID COOLING FOR INCINERATORS

Title (de)

ROSTSTAB MIT FLÜSSIGKÜHLUNG FÜR VERBRENNUNGSANLAGEN

Title (fr)

BARREAU DE GRILLE A REFROIDISSEMENT PAR DU LIQUIDE POUR DES INCINERATEURS

Publication

EP 1315936 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00954246 A

Priority

CH 0000467 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0221049A1] The invention relates to a grate bar (1) for producing a grate for incinerators. Said grate bar has a continuous channel (6) for guiding the liquid coolant through. Said channel has tubular segments (7) which run parallel to the side edge (1') or the upper surface (5) of the grate (1). The ends of two adjacent tubular segments (7) respectively are interconnected by tubular pieces (8), especially in a U-shape, at their front ends in the area of the nose (3) of the grate (1). This positioning of the coolant channel (6) provides a high degree of protection against damage, even in the presence of considerable thermal stresses, especially on the nose area (3) of the grate bar (1). This results in especially advantageous emergency running properties of the grate bar (1), even in the event of a breakdown in the liquid cooling system. The inventive configuration of the coolant channel (6) also advantageously permits cooling at high pressures, which results in a higher degree of cooling efficiency and therefore a better degree of efficiency for the incinerator overall.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23H 3/02; F23H 17/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23H 3/02 (2006.01); F23H 17/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23H 17/12 (2013.01); F23H 3/02 (2013.01); F23H 2900/03021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0221049A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0221049 A1 20020314; AU 6679700 A 20020322; DE 50012741 D1 20060614; EP 1315936 A1 20030604; EP 1315936 B1 20060510

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171001

2018-05-09 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20171001

2018-04-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50012741

2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160929

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160531

2016-05-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50012741

- Representative's name: VIERING, JENTSCHURA & PARTNER MBB PATENT- UND , DE

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150904

2016-04-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140919

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MH POWER SYSTEMS EUROPE SERVICE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HITACHI POWER EUROPE SERVICE GMBH, DE

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140929

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-12-10 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20141201

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140919

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140919

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-10-24 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: MH POWER SYSTEMS EUROPE SERVICE GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20140919

2014-09-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MH POWER SYSTEMS EUROPE SERVICE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HITACHI POWER EUROPE SERVICE GMBH, 47229 DUISBURG, DE

- Document: DE 50012741

- Effective date: 20140728

2014-09-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50012741

- Representative's name: STENGER WATZKE RING INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY, DE

- Effective date: 20140728

2014-09-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50012741

- Representative's name: VIERING, JENTSCHURA & PARTNER MBB PATENT- UND , DE

- Effective date: 20140728

2014-07-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50012741

- Representative's name: STENGER WATZKE RING INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY, DE

2012-11-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HITACHI POWER EUROPE SERVICE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: XERVON ENERGY GMBH, 47229 DUISBURG, DE

- Document: DE 50012741

- Effective date: 20120926

2012-11-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MH POWER SYSTEMS EUROPE SERVICE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: XERVON ENERGY GMBH, 47229 DUISBURG, DE

- Document: DE 50012741

- Effective date: 20120926

2012-11-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50012741

- Representative's name: STENGER WATZKE RING INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY, DE

- Effective date: 20120926

2012-11-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50012741

- Representative's name: VIERING, JENTSCHURA & PARTNER MBB PATENT- UND , DE

- Effective date: 20120926

2012-11-02 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: HITACHI POWER EUROPE SERVICE GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20121004

2012-09-30 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: HITACHI POWER EUROPE SERVICE G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20120928

2012-09-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: HITACHI POWER EUROPE SERVICE GMBH

- Free text: XERVON ENERGY GMBH#FRIEDRICH-EBERT-STRASSE 134#47229 DUISBURG (DE) -TRANSFER TO- HITACHI POWER EUROPE SERVICE GMBH#FRIEDRICH-EBERT-STRASSE 134#47229 DUISBURG (DE)

2012-09-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50012741

- Representative's name: STENGER WATZKE RING INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY, DE

2012-09-26 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20120920

2012-08-10 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20120711

2012-08-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: XERVON ENERGY GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20120711

2012-06-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: XERVON ENERGY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: XERVON ENERGY GMBH, 47138 DUISBURG, DE

- Document: DE 50012741

- Effective date: 20120620

2012-06-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: XERVON ENERGY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: THYSSENKRUPP XERVON ENERGY GMBH, 47138 DUISBURG, DE

- Document: DE 50012741

- Effective date: 20120509

2012-06-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HITACHI POWER EUROPE SERVICE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: THYSSENKRUPP XERVON ENERGY GMBH, 47138 DUISBURG, DE

- Document: DE 50012741

- Effective date: 20120509

2012-06-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HITACHI POWER EUROPE SERVICE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: XERVON ENERGY GMBH, 47138 DUISBURG, DE

- Document: DE 50012741

- Effective date: 20120620

2012-06-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MH POWER SYSTEMS EUROPE SERVICE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: THYSSENKRUPP XERVON ENERGY GMBH, 47138 DUISBURG, DE

- Document: DE 50012741

- Effective date: 20120509

2012-06-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MH POWER SYSTEMS EUROPE SERVICE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: XERVON ENERGY GMBH, 47138 DUISBURG, DE

- Document: DE 50012741

- Effective date: 20120620

2012-06-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50012741

- Representative's name: STENGER WATZKE RING INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY, DE

- Effective date: 20120620

2012-06-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50012741

- Representative's name: STENGER WATZKE RING INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY, DE

- Effective date: 20120509

2012-06-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50012741

- Representative's name: VIERING, JENTSCHURA & PARTNER MBB PATENT- UND , DE

- Effective date: 20120620

2012-06-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50012741

- Representative's name: VIERING, JENTSCHURA & PARTNER MBB PATENT- UND , DE

- Effective date: 20120509

2012-06-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: XERVON ENERGY GMBH

- Free text: THYSSENKRUPP XERVON ENERGY GMBH#BALDUSSTRASSE 13#47138 DUISBURG (DE) -TRANSFER TO- XERVON ENERGY GMBH#FRIEDRICH-EBERT-STRASSE 134#47229 DUISBURG (DE)

2012-05-30 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20120521

2012-05-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50012741

- Representative's name: STENGER WATZKE RING INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY, DE

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *THYSSENKRUPP XERVON ENERGY G.M.B.H.BALDUSSTRASSE

- Effective date: 20060510

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *THYSSENKRUPP XERVON ENERGY G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20060510

2007-04-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070213

2007-02-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP XERVON ENERGY GMBH

- Effective date: 20061122

2007-01-19 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-12-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2006-10-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP XERVON ENERGY GMBH

- Free text: SEKO-PATENT GMBH#BUTZENSTRASSE 20#8304 WALLISELLEN (CH) -TRANSFER TO- THYSSENKRUPP XERVON ENERGY GMBH#BALDUSSTRASSE 13#47138 DUISBURG (DE)

2006-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2006-06-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012741 P 20060614

2006-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI NL

2005-08-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SEKO-PATENT GMBH

2005-08-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KOCH, THEODOR

2005-04-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050221

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI NL

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030213

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI