Global Patent Index - EP 1315967 A2

EP 1315967 A2 2003-06-04 - IMMUNOSENSOR

Title (en)

IMMUNOSENSOR

Title (de)

IMMUNOSENSOR

Title (fr)

IMMUNODETECTEUR

Publication

EP 1315967 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01961641 A

Priority

  • US 0122202 W
  • US 61569100 A
  • US 61643300 A
  • US 61651200 A
  • US 61655600 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0208763A2] This invention describes a quantitative, inexpensive, disposable immunosensor 20 that requires no wash steps and thus generates no liquid waste. Moreover, in preferred embodiments of the sensor 20 no timing steps are required of the user, and the sensor 20 can be readily adapted to antigen-antibody interactions over a wide kinetic range.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/543

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/483 (2006.01); C12Q 1/00 (2006.01); G01N 27/28 (2006.01); G01N 27/30 (2006.01); G01N 27/327 (2006.01); G01N 27/416 (2006.01); G01N 27/42 (2006.01); G01N 27/44 (2006.01); G01N 33/543 (2006.01); G01N 33/66 (2006.01); G01N 33/72 (2006.01); G01N 33/84 (2006.01); G01N 33/487 (2006.01); G01N 33/49 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/004 (2013.01); C12Q 1/006 (2013.01); G01N 33/84 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0208763A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0208763 A2 20020131; WO 0208763 A3 20020613; AR 029723 A1 20030710; AT 349695 T 20070115; AU 2001273197 B2 20060525; AU 2001276888 B2 20060316; AU 7319701 A 20020130; AU 7590201 A 20020130; AU 7688801 A 20020130; AU 8289001 A 20020205; CA 2415342 A1 20020124; CA 2415602 A1 20020131; CA 2415602 C 20120410; CA 2416207 A1 20020124; CA 2416207 C 20110830; CA 2416249 A1 20020124; CN 1252471 C 20060419; CN 1313822 C 20070502; CN 1441901 A 20030910; CN 1441902 A 20030910; CN 1441903 A 20030910; CN 1441905 A 20030910; CZ 20030409 A3 20031015; CZ 20030416 A3 20040218; DE 60125544 D1 20070208; DE 60125544 T2 20071004; EP 1301780 A2 20030416; EP 1303758 A2 20030423; EP 1303758 B1 20061227; EP 1311849 A2 20030521; EP 1315967 A2 20030604; ES 2277933 T3 20070801; HK 1055147 A1 20070511; IL 153582 D0 20030706; IL 153583 D0 20030706; IL 153584 D0 20030706; IL 153585 D0 20030706; JP 2004504597 A 20040212; JP 2004504604 A 20040212; JP 2004530099 A 20040930; JP 4948737 B2 20120606; KR 100828450 B1 20080513; KR 100884501 B1 20090218; KR 20030036605 A 20030509; KR 20030036609 A 20030509; KR 20030038664 A 20030516; KR 20030038665 A 20030516; KR 20080003941 A 20080108; MX PA03000382 A 20040913; MX PA03000383 A 20040913; NO 20030017 A 20030313; NO 20030017 D0 20030102; NO 20030027 A 20030303; NO 20030027 D0 20030103; PL 359335 A1 20040823; PL 359860 A1 20040906; SG 138459 A1 20080128; SG 140463 A1 20080328; TW I238890 B 20050901; WO 0206788 A2 20020124; WO 0206788 A3 20020829; WO 0206788 A8 20031106; WO 0206806 A2 20020124; WO 0206806 A3 20021017; WO 0206828 A2 20020124; WO 0206828 A3 20020815; WO 0206828 A8 20031106

INPADOC legal status


2013-02-08 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1056398

2012-05-09 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20110315

2011-03-15 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2007-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070612

2003-08-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LIFESCAN, INC.

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030212

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI