Global Patent Index - EP 1315988 A2

EP 1315988 A2 2003-06-04 - APODIZATION METHOD FOR A BRAGG GRATING

Title (en)

APODIZATION METHOD FOR A BRAGG GRATING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR APODISIERUNG EINES BRAGG-GITTERS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'APODISATION D'UN RESEAU DE BRAGG

Publication

EP 1315988 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 01965372 A

Priority

  • FR 0102691 W
  • FR 0011066 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2813398A1] The invention concerns a method for photoimprinting a Bragg grating on an optical fibre (300) or guide, which comprises a step which consists in exposing a selected zone of the fibre (300) or guide with a light beam (120) using a mirror (200) so as to fold a part (122) of the beam source (120) reflected by the mirror (200) on a part (224) of the beam source not reflected by the mirror and to obtain a diffraction grating on the fibre (300) or guide. The invention is characterised in that it comprises a step which consists in further exposing said part of the fibre (300) or guide, and in carrying out a relative displacement of the elements among the beam (120), the fibre (300) or the guide and the mirror (200) between the two exposure steps, so that one same part of the beam (120) used for photoimprinting in the two exposure steps, is reflected by the mirror (200) in one of the two steps and not reflected by the mirror (200) in the other step.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 6/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/02 (2006.01); G02B 5/18 (2006.01); G02B 6/10 (2006.01); G02B 6/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/02133 (2013.01); G02B 6/02085 (2013.01); G02B 6/02152 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0218996A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2813398 A1 20020301; FR 2813398 B1 20031205; AU 8602101 A 20020313; EP 1315988 A2 20030604; US 2004096156 A1 20040520; US 6868208 B2 20050315; WO 0218996 A2 20020307; WO 0218996 A3 20020718

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-06-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G02B 6/02 20060101AFI20060420BHEP

2004-12-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2004-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040423

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE GB IT LI

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI