Global Patent Index - EP 1316012 A2

EP 1316012 A2 2003-06-04 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SYNCHRONISING A PROGRAMME RUNNING ON A FIRST COMPUTER WITH A PROGRAMME RUNNING ON A SERVER, COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM AND COMPUTER PROGRAMME ELEMENT

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SYNCHRONISING A PROGRAMME RUNNING ON A FIRST COMPUTER WITH A PROGRAMME RUNNING ON A SERVER, COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM AND COMPUTER PROGRAMME ELEMENT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR SYNCHRONISATION EINES AUF EINEM ERSTEN RECHNER ABLAUFENDEN PROGRAMMS MIT EINEM AUF EINEM SERVER ABLAUFENDEN PROGRAMM, COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM-ELEMENT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE SYNCHRONISER UN PROGRAMME EXECUTE SUR UN PREMIER ORDINATEUR ET UN PROGRAMME EXECUTE SUR UN SERVEUR, SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR ET ELEMENT PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR

Publication

EP 1316012 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01911343 A

Priority

  • DE 0100093 W
  • DE 10008616 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0163399A2] The programme that is running on the server continues to run without a connection to the first computer and carries out state changes. As soon as an existing connection has been interrupted, the state of the first computer is stored within the programme that is running on the server. The programme is continued and state changes are logged. The state changes are initiated by the server. Once a new connection has been established, the programmes are synchronised.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 13/12 (2006.01); G06F 9/45 (2006.01); G06F 9/52 (2006.01); G06F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 8/458 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0163399A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0163399 A2 20010830; WO 0163399 A3 20030327; CA 2400967 A1 20010830; EP 1316012 A2 20030604; IL 151330 A 20071203; IL 151330 D0 20030410; JP 2003529826 A 20031007; US 2003149721 A1 20030807

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081108

2007-12-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

2007-11-14 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS S.P.A.

2007-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070914

2007-09-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020807

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR