Global Patent Index - EP 1316035 A1

EP 1316035 A1 2003-06-04 - MULTIFUNCTIONAL MOBILE BANKING SYSTEM

Title (en)

MULTIFUNCTIONAL MOBILE BANKING SYSTEM

Title (de)

MEHRFUNKTIONS-MOBIL-BANK-SYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME BANCAIRE MOBILE MULTIFONCTIONS

Publication

EP 1316035 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01913300 A

Priority

  • US 0106922 W
  • US 63498400 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0213120A1] An integrated transaction management system (300) includes a communications gateway (350) for conducting communications and transactions with a plurality of financial data networks utilizing a plurality of communications protocols, a plurality of interface servers (330) providing an interface between a user and a plurality of financial service applications including ATMs (333), POS (335), Internet-based banking (314), telephone-based banking, wireless short messaging services, and wireless applications (312) protocol-based banking.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60; G07F 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 19/00 (2006.01); G06F 9/46 (2006.01); G06Q 20/00 (2012.01); G06Q 40/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/542 (2013.01); G06Q 20/04 (2013.01); G06Q 20/10 (2013.01); G06Q 20/3223 (2013.01); G06Q 20/425 (2013.01); G06Q 40/02 (2013.01); G07F 19/211 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0213120 A1 20020214; AU 2001241977 B2 20070823; AU 4197701 A 20020218; CA 2418991 A1 20020214; CN 1555535 A 20041215; CZ 20031107 A3 20040114; EP 1316035 A1 20030604; EP 1316035 A4 20060517; HR P20030164 A2 20040630; HU 0301709 A2 20030929; HU 0301709 A3 20050530; HU 230453 B1 20160728; NZ 523880 A 20051125; PL 365196 A1 20041227; RS 49909 B 20080929; YU 9203 A 20040903

INPADOC legal status


2016-09-30 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1055158

2016-06-15 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20151215

2015-12-15 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2006-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060725

2006-05-17 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060405

2006-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G07F 19/00 20060101AFI20060330BHEP

2006-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 9/46 20060101ALI20060330BHEP

2006-01-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 17/60 19950101AFI20020218BHEP

2006-01-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G07F 19/00 19900101ALI20051117BHEP

2003-12-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EURONET WORLDWIDE, INC.

2003-07-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CLARY, JEFFREY, S.

2003-07-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LILES, KEVIN, G.

2003-07-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MILLS, MARK, A.

2003-07-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VRANA, KENNETH, J.

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030206

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI