Global Patent Index - EP 1316058 A1

EP 1316058 A1 2003-06-04 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A POSITION CODE ON A PAPER

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING A POSITION CODE ON A PAPER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES POSITIONSCODES AUF EINEM PAPIER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE UN CODE DE POSITION SUR UN PAPIER

Publication

EP 1316058 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01963651 A

Priority

  • SE 0101842 W
  • SE 0001667 W
  • SE 0002640 W
  • SE 0002641 W
  • SE 0002659 W
  • SE 0100724 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0219260A1] A method and a computer program are described for developing a product (110), and services associated with the product, which product has at least one activation area (308) which is provided with a position code (403) that codes at least one position on an imaginary surface (601), which position causes a device (710) that detects the positon code (403) to initiate an operation that utilizes information recorded by the device (710) that detects the position code (403) to initiate an operation that utilizes information recoded by the device (710). A digital representation of at least part of the product comprising image points is produced, each image point in the digital representation of the activation area (3-8) correspoinding to a position of the imaginary surface (601). A digital template that can be used for making the digital representation of the product is also described.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 11/06; G06K 19/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 21/00 (2006.01); B41J 21/16 (2006.01); G06F 3/03 (2006.01); G06F 3/033 (2006.01); G06F 3/042 (2006.01); G06K 7/00 (2006.01); G06K 9/22 (2006.01); G06K 17/00 (2006.01); G06K 19/00 (2006.01); G09F 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06K 9/222 (2013.01); G06F 3/0321 (2013.01); G09F 23/06 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

  • US 5661506 A 19970826 - LAZZOUNI MOHAMED [US], et al
  • US 5852434 A 19981222 - SEKENDUR ORAL F [US]
  • DYMETMAN M; COPPERMAN M: "Intelligent paper", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, vol. 1375, March 1998 (1998-03-01), pages 392 - 406, XP002328425
  • See also references of WO 0219260A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0219260 A1 20020307; EP 1316058 A1 20030604; JP 2004507852 A 20040311

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080425

2008-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071214

2006-06-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANOTO AB

2005-08-03 [111L] LICENCES

- Free text: 0100 LEAPFROG ENTERPRISES INC.

- Effective date: 20050530

2005-03-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANOTO IP LIC HB

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI