Global Patent Index - EP 1316062 A1

EP 1316062 A1 2003-06-04 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING CHIPS, ESPECIALLY FOR SIM CARDS,IN A SERIES.

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING CHIPS, ESPECIALLY FOR SIM CARDS,IN A SERIES.

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR SERIENHERSTELLUNG VON CHIPS, INSBESONDERE FÜR SIM-KARTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE PUCES EN SERIE, NOTAMMENT POUR DES CARTES SIM

Publication

EP 1316062 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01960678 A

Priority

  • EP 01960678 A
  • EP 0109550 W
  • EP 00119162 A
  • EP 00119163 A
  • EP 00121636 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1187065A2] The method involves producing software, installing the software on a chip and applying chip-carrier related and user-related personalization data to the chip. The chip-carrier related data are applied to the chip and the user-related personalization data are applied separately in a later production step. Independent claims are also included for the following: an arrangement for testing wafers, an arrangement for manufacturing chip modules, an arrangement for testing chip modules, an arrangement for embedding chip modules in a carrier and an arrangement for personalizing chips embedded in a carrier.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 19/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06K 17/00 (2006.01); G06K 19/07 (2006.01); G06K 19/077 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06K 19/07716 (2013.01); G06K 17/00 (2013.01); G06K 19/07 (2013.01); G06K 19/07743 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0221434A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1187065 A2 20020313; EP 1187065 A3 20020731; AU 8210301 A 20020322; EP 1316062 A1 20030604; US 2004015612 A1 20040122; WO 0221434 A1 20020314

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-14 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20080516

2006-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20051031

2004-09-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ACG IDENTIFICATION GMBH

2003-07-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ACG IDENTIFICATION TECHNOLOGIES GMBH

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI