Global Patent Index - EP 1316096 A1

EP 1316096 A1 2003-06-04 - ELECTRODE AND CAPACITOR PROVIDED WITH SAID ELECTRODE

Title (en)

ELECTRODE AND CAPACITOR PROVIDED WITH SAID ELECTRODE

Title (de)

ELEKTRODE UND KONDENSATOR MIT DER ELEKTRODE

Title (fr)

ELECTRODE ET CONDENSATEUR MUNI D'UNE ELECTRODE

Publication

EP 1316096 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01957739 A

Priority

  • DE 0102876 W
  • DE 10044451 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0221549A1] The invention relates to an electrode for a capacitor provided with an electrode arrester (1) and with an electrode body (2), which is in contact with the electrode arrester (1) and on whose surface a dielectric layer (3) is arranged. An intermediate layer (4) is arranged between the electrode body (2) and the dielectric layer (3) and inhibits the exchange of matter between said dielectric layer (3) and electrode body (2). The intermediate layer (4) assists in reducing, in particular, the diffusion of oxygen from the dielectric layer (3) into the electrode body (2) thus providing the electrode with a greater long-time stability. The invention also relates to a capacitor, which comprises the inventive electrode that serves as an anode.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01G 9/042

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01G 9/07 (2006.01); H01G 4/06 (2006.01); H01G 9/00 (2006.01); H01G 9/04 (2006.01); H01G 9/042 (2006.01); H01G 9/052 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01G 9/0032 (2013.01); H01G 9/042 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0221549A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0221549 A1 20020314; AU 7957201 A 20020322; CN 100380545 C 20080409; CN 1473339 A 20040204; DE 10044451 C1 20020404; EP 1316096 A1 20030604; EP 1316096 B1 20071114; JP 2004508726 A 20040318; TW 529049 B 20030421; US 6370017 B1 20020409

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150730

2016-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150730

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140721

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140724

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080815

2008-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-02-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080130

2007-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB

2007-11-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-11-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): FR GB

2004-06-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE FR GB

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030204

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR