Global Patent Index - EP 1316099 A1

EP 1316099 A1 2003-06-04 - PROTECTED STRUCTURE OF FLAT PANEL DISPLAY

Title (en)

PROTECTED STRUCTURE OF FLAT PANEL DISPLAY

Title (de)

GESCHÜTZTE STRUKTUR EINER FLACHANZEIGE

Title (fr)

STRUCTURE PROTEGEE POUR UN AFFICHAGE A ECRAN PLAT

Publication

EP 1316099 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01959303 A

Priority

  • US 0123814 W
  • US 62735500 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0211169A1] A protected faceplate structure (900) includes a faceplate (100) and a barrier layer (902) of silica. The faceplate (100) may be made of soda glass, and the barrier layer (902) may be made of silica.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 1/70; H01J 1/304; H01J 19/24; H01J 31/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 9/02 (2006.01); H01J 1/30 (2006.01); H01J 1/304 (2006.01); H01J 1/70 (2006.01); H01J 9/22 (2006.01); H01J 9/227 (2006.01); H01J 29/04 (2006.01); H01J 29/06 (2006.01); H01J 29/08 (2006.01); H01J 29/28 (2006.01); H01J 29/32 (2006.01); H01J 31/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 1/304 (2013.01); H01J 29/06 (2013.01); H01J 29/085 (2013.01); H01J 31/127 (2013.01); H01J 2201/02 (2013.01); H01J 2211/36 (2013.01); H01J 2329/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0211169 A1 20020207; AU 8087201 A 20020213; EP 1316099 A1 20030604; EP 1316099 A4 20051221; JP 2004505427 A 20040219; KR 100845433 B1 20080710; KR 20030061779 A 20030722; TW I270911 B 20070111

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-11 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1056436

2010-03-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090908

2009-04-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090225

2007-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2007-03-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CANDESCENT INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY SERVICES, INC.

2005-12-21 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20051104

2005-12-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01J 1/70 A

2005-12-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01J 1/304 B

2005-12-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01J 19/24 B

2005-12-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01J 31/12 B

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE NL

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030221

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI