Global Patent Index - EP 1316119 A4

EP 1316119 A4 2009-02-11 - MICROCELL ELECTROCHEMICAL DEVICES AND ASSEMBLIES, AND METHOD OF MAKING AND USING THE SAME

Title (en)

MICROCELL ELECTROCHEMICAL DEVICES AND ASSEMBLIES, AND METHOD OF MAKING AND USING THE SAME

Title (de)

MIKROZELLULÄRE ELEKTROCHEMISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN UND ANORDNUNGENUND ENTSPRECHENDE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIFS ET ENSEMBLES ELECTROCHIMIQUES A MICROCELLULES ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET D'UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1316119 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 01961707 A

Priority

  • US 0123220 W
  • US 62521900 A
  • US 62430300 A
  • US 62171300 A
  • US 62122800 A
  • US 62407000 A
  • US 62521800 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0209212A1] Microcell structures and assemblies are efficiently utilized for electrochemical generation/conversion of energy. The microcell structures of the invention are readily constructed from discrete fibrous microcell elements that are fabricated in sheet form (60, 62, 64, 66) and assembled into layered, sub-bundled and bundled conformations that produce high voltage, high power density outputs in applications such as fuel cell and battery systems.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01M 4/86 (2006.01); H01M 8/02 (2006.01); H01M 2/18 (2006.01); H01M 2/20 (2006.01); H01M 4/88 (2006.01); H01M 6/10 (2006.01); H01M 6/44 (2006.01); H01M 8/04 (2006.01); H01M 8/06 (2006.01); H01M 8/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01M 8/004 (2013.01); H01M 2/145 (2013.01); H01M 2/185 (2013.01); H01M 4/70 (2013.01); H01M 4/8668 (2013.01); H01M 4/8846 (2013.01); H01M 4/8864 (2013.01); H01M 4/8892 (2013.01); H01M 4/94 (2013.01); H01M 6/44 (2013.01); H01M 8/0247 (2013.01); H01M 8/04007 (2013.01); H01M 8/0668 (2013.01); H01M 8/241 (2013.01); H01M 8/2418 (2016.02); H01M 8/243 (2013.01); H01M 10/613 (2015.04); H01M 10/625 (2015.04); H01M 10/643 (2015.04); H01M 10/6557 (2015.04); H01M 10/6567 (2015.04); H01M 8/04074 (2013.01); H01M 8/249 (2013.01); H01M 10/0472 (2013.01); H01M 2004/022 (2013.01); Y02P 70/56 (2015.11)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0209212 A1 20020131; AU 2001282953 B2 20050707; AU 2004202981 A1 20040729; AU 2004202981 B2 20070315; AU 8295301 A 20020205; CA 2417682 A1 20020131; CA 2417682 C 20070626; CN 100353590 C 20071205; CN 1466783 A 20040107; EP 1316119 A1 20030604; EP 1316119 A4 20090211; JP 2004505417 A 20040219; KR 20030038678 A 20030516; NZ 523874 A 20040430; NZ 530851 A 20050624; NZ 539683 A 20061130

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110201

2010-10-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: MICROCELL ASSEMBLY AND METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME

2009-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090529

2009-02-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090114

2009-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01M 8/02 20060101AFI20090108BHEP

2009-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01M 2/18 20060101ALI20090108BHEP

2009-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01M 4/86 20060101ALI20090108BHEP

2009-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01M 4/88 20060101ALI20090108BHEP

2009-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01M 6/10 20060101ALI20090108BHEP

2009-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01M 6/44 20060101ALI20090108BHEP

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI