Global Patent Index - EP 1316167 A2

EP 1316167 A2 2003-06-04 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR COMMUNICATION WITH THE INTERNET

Title (en)

METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR COMMUNICATION WITH THE INTERNET

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR DIE DATENÜBERTRAGUNG VON UND ZU DEM INTERNET MIT VERWENDUNG EINES KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZES UND EINES RUNDFUNKSYSTEMS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION AVEC INTERNET

Publication

EP 1316167 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01967306 A

Priority

  • DE 10044161 A
  • EP 0110061 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0221738A2] The invention relates to a method and a system for communicating with the internet, whereby at least one communication network and one radio system is used for a connection between a terminal and the internet. The radio system allows the transmission of selected information available on the internet. On the user side, a terminal is provided which comprises a communication device for communicating with the internet via a communication network and devices for receiving and processing the internet information transmitted by the radio system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00; H04L 12/28; H04L 29/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/86 (2008.01); H04N 7/173 (2011.01); H04H 60/91 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 7/17336 (2013.01); H04H 20/86 (2013.01); H04N 21/23617 (2013.01); H04N 21/2381 (2013.01); H04N 21/2408 (2013.01); H04N 21/4622 (2013.01); H04N 21/6112 (2013.01); H04N 21/6181 (2013.01); H04H 20/16 (2013.01); H04H 60/91 (2013.01); H04H 2201/20 (2013.01); H04H 2201/33 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0221738A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0221738 A2 20020314; WO 0221738 A3 20021227; AU 8770901 A 20020322; DE 10044161 A1 20020321; DE 10044161 B4 20061207; EP 1316167 A2 20030604; US 2004014465 A1 20040122; US 7058394 B2 20060606

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-31 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20091208

2008-06-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: T-MOBILE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2008-06-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROHDE & SCHWARZ GMBH & CO. KG

2008-04-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DETEMOBIL DEUTSCHE TELEKOM MOBILNET GMBH

2008-04-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROHDE & SCHWARZ GMBH & CO. KG

2006-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061024

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB NL

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOEGELSACK, MARTIN

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ZUREK-TERHARDT, GUENTHER

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030226

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI