Global Patent Index - EP 1316189 A2

EP 1316189 A2 2003-06-04 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR THE WIRELESS ACCESS OF COMPUTER-BASED SERVICES IN AN ATTRIBUTABLE MANNER

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR THE WIRELESS ACCESS OF COMPUTER-BASED SERVICES IN AN ATTRIBUTABLE MANNER

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ZURECHENBAREN DRAHTLOSEN ZUGREIFEN AUF COMPUTERBASIERTE SERVICELEISTUNGEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR L'ACCES SANS FIL RESPONSABLE A DES PRESTATIONS DE SERVICE INFORMATIQUES

Publication

EP 1316189 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01969662 A

Priority

  • EP 0109915 W
  • US 23015600 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0219648A2] The invention relates to a method for the wireless access of computer-based services in an attributable manner, using a mobile hand-held device (11), by a service user (2) who is temporarily in the vicinity of a local service computer (26), on which service software (3) comprising an input for services (5) and preferably an output for services (6) is run. Said service software (3) can be distributed among additional service computers (4). To access said services, the service user (2) uses a personal, mobile hand-held device (11), which comprises a standard input/output (14) and preferably a simulation system (12) for the interactive entry of service data. The mobile hand-held device (11) for accessing a service interacts with the service software (3) via a distributed service access (17) and a wireless connection (10). The mobile hand-held device (11) and the service computer (3) transmit data, whose attributability is to be guaranteed, by means of digital signatures, according to an agreed protocol (25). Said data can be summarised in certificates and transaction data records (9) and can be obtained in part on the mobile hand-held device (11), using read devices (13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 29/06; H04Q 7/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 1/16 (2006.01); G07F 17/16 (2006.01); H04L 12/28 (2006.01); H04L 12/56 (2006.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04L 29/08 (2006.01); H04M 1/725 (2006.01); H04M 3/493 (2006.01); H04W 12/06 (2009.01); H04M 1/27 (2006.01); H04W 84/18 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 20/12 (2013.01); G06Q 20/123 (2013.01); G06Q 20/32 (2013.01); G06Q 20/322 (2013.01); G06Q 20/327 (2013.01); G06Q 30/0601 (2013.01); G07F 17/16 (2013.01); H04L 29/06 (2013.01); H04L 63/0823 (2013.01); H04L 63/12 (2013.01); H04L 67/04 (2013.01); H04L 67/16 (2013.01); H04L 67/18 (2013.01); H04L 69/329 (2013.01); H04M 1/0254 (2013.01); H04M 1/7253 (2013.01); H04M 3/493 (2013.01); H04M 3/4938 (2013.01); H04W 12/06 (2013.01); H04W 12/08 (2013.01); H04W 12/10 (2013.01); H04M 1/271 (2013.01); H04M 2207/18 (2013.01); H04M 2250/02 (2013.01); H04M 2250/12 (2013.01); H04M 2250/14 (2013.01); H04W 84/18 (2013.01); H04W 88/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0219648A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0219648 A2 20020307; WO 0219648 A3 20021212; AU 8984501 A 20020313; EP 1316189 A2 20030604; US 2004002902 A1 20040101

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050810

2005-12-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAP AG

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040129

2003-12-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAP AG

2003-12-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MUEHLHAEUSER, MAX

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI