Global Patent Index - EP 1316265 A1

EP 1316265 A1 2003-06-04 - Sport shoe, in particular ski shoe

Title (en)

Sport shoe, in particular ski shoe

Title (de)

Sportschuh, insbesondere Schischuh

Title (fr)

Chaussure de sport, notamment chaussure de ski

Publication

EP 1316265 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02023447 A

Priority

AT 17402001 A

Abstract (en)

Sports shoe, especially a ski shoe, comprises a shell part (3), a sleeve pivotally fixed on the shell part, and a step element (22) forming bearing surfaces on opposite-lying end regions of the shell part and provided with coupling protrusions (27). The step element is fixed on the shell part in the center relative to the central longitudinal axis (41) via a base element having a clamping and fixing arrangement. The coupling protrusion of the step element protrudes over the shell part asymmetrically relative to the central longitudinal axis. <??>An Independent claim is also included for a step element for a sports shoe. Preferred Features: An axis of symmetry (42) extending through the coupling protrusion runs at an angle to the central longitudinal axis. The step element is provided with a non-slip, wear-resistant coating forming the bearing surface.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Sportschuh (1), insbesondere Schischuh (2), mit einem Schalenteil (3) und mit einer am Schalenteil (3) verschwenkbar befestigten Manschette und mit an entgegengesetzten Endbereichen (19, 20) am Schalenteil (3) befestigte Aufstandsflächen (24) ausbildende und mit Kupplungsfortsätzen (27) versehene Absatzelemente (22).Das Absatzelement (22) ist über ein eine Spann- und Befestigungsanordnung (23) aufweisendes Basiselement (48) zentriert in bezug auf eine Längsmittelachse (41) am Schalenteil (3) befestigt und der Kupplungsfortsatz (27) des Absatzelementes (22) überragt den Schalenteil (3) in bezug auf die Längsmittelachse (41) asymmetrisch. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/0468 (2013.01); A43B 5/0417 (2013.01); A43B 5/0421 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316265 A1 20030604; EP 1316265 B1 20050928; AT 500078 A1 20051015; AT 500078 B1 20060415; AT 500078 B8 20070215; DE 50204385 D1 20051103

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171018

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161102

2017-07-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170630

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-07-11 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20140606

2007-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-09-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060629

2006-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50204385 P 20051103

2005-10-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051021

2005-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-09-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI