Global Patent Index - EP 1316268 A2

EP 1316268 A2 2003-06-04 - Boot liner with gel pads

Title (en)

Boot liner with gel pads

Title (de)

Innenschuh mit Gelkissen

Title (fr)

Chausson pour botte avec coussinets remplis de gel

Publication

EP 1316268 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02026154 A

Priority

US 99639801 A

Abstract (en)

A boot (1) with a resilient pad fixed inside the cloth and foam layers forming the toe box (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 19/00; A43B 5/04; A43B 23/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/04 (2006.01); A43B 7/26 (2006.01); A43B 7/32 (2006.01); A43B 23/08 (2006.01); A43B 23/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 7/32 (2013.01); A43B 5/0405 (2013.01); A43B 23/086 (2013.01); A43B 23/16 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316268 A2 20030604; EP 1316268 A3 20040114; CA 2412976 A1 20030528; CN 1283192 C 20061108; CN 1422574 A 20030611; JP 2003180401 A 20030702; TW 200300337 A 20030601; TW I220859 B 20040911; US 2003097768 A1 20030529

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-26 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080603

2004-10-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-01-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 43B 19/00 A

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 43B 5/04 B

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 43B 23/16 B

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI