Global Patent Index - EP 1316270 A1

EP 1316270 A1 2003-06-04 - Portable dryer with different circuit designs

Title (en)

Portable dryer with different circuit designs

Title (de)

Tragbarer Trockner mit verschiedenen Schaltkreisen

Title (fr)

Séchoir portable avec des circuits différents

Publication

EP 1316270 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01128766 A

Priority

EP 01128766 A

Abstract (en)

A portable dryer includes a housing (1), a motor (2) installed with a fan (21) inside the housing (1), an electric heating element (3) electrically connected to the motor (2) for generating heat, a switch (5) electrically connected to the motor (2), and a battery (6) for supplying electric power to the portable dryer. When the switch (5) is turned on, the battery (6) can supply electric power to the motor (2) and the electric heating element (3), making the electric heating element (3) generate heat and the motor (2) drive the fan (21) and thus blowing out hot air generated by the electric heating element (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 20/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 20/10 (2006.01); A45D 20/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 20/12 (2013.01); A45D 20/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316270 A1 20030604; EP 1316270 B1 20060208; DE 60117094 D1 20060420; DE 60117094 T2 20060914

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141203

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-09-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150831

2015-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141203

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60117094

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131227

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131230

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061109

2006-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60117094 P 20060420

2006-02-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-02-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040220

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011203

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI