Global Patent Index - EP 1316272 A2

EP 1316272 A2 2003-06-04 - Set of shelves

Title (en)

Set of shelves

Title (de)

Regal

Title (fr)

Rayonnage

Publication

EP 1316272 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02023335 A

Priority

DE 20119392 U

Abstract (en)

Shelving unit comprises a rear wall (1) and at least one attached shelf (2). A support profile (3) is fixed to the rear wall and joined in a form-locking manner to a holding strip (4) on which the shelf is positioned. <??>Preferred Features: The support profile lies in a groove on the rear wall. The shelf, preferably a glass shelf, is stuck to the holding strip. The support profile has a recess into which the nose of the holding strip is inserted.

Abstract (de)

Ein Regal, bestehend aus einer Rückwand (1) und zumindest einem daran befestigten Regalboden (2), ist so ausgestaltet, daß zur Festlegung des Regalbodens (2) an der Rückwand (1) ein Tragprofil (3) befestigt ist, mit dem eine Halteleiste (4) formschlüssig verbunden ist, an der der Regalboden (2) festgelegt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 57/42; A47B 57/40; A47F 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/061 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20119392 U1 20020221; EP 1316272 A2 20030604; EP 1316272 A3 20040310

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040911

2005-01-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-12-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47B 57/42 A

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47B 57/40 B

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47F 5/08 B

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI