Global Patent Index - EP 1316274 A2

EP 1316274 A2 2003-06-04 - Kitchen furniture with a worktop

Title (en)

Kitchen furniture with a worktop

Title (de)

Küchenmöbel mit einer Arbeitsplatte

Title (fr)

Meuble de cuisine avec une surface de travail

Publication

EP 1316274 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02023270 A

Priority

DE 20119389 U

Abstract (en)

A worktop support on top of floor mounted kitchen units uses the space between the units and the worktop for additional storage. Drawers fitted into the storage unit have front faces with the same trim as the remainder of the support. The thickness of the worktop is reduced to the minimum required for the loading, leaving a maximum of storage space.

Abstract (de)

Ein Küchenmöbel mit einer Arbeitsplatte (2) und einem Unterschrank (1), ist so ausgestaltet, daß die Arbeitsplatte (2) auf einem sichtseitig verblendeten Tragelement (3) aufliegt, die sich am Unterschrank (1) abstützt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 77/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 67/04 (2006.01); A47B 95/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 67/04 (2013.01); A47B 95/043 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20119389 U1 20020214; EP 1316274 A2 20030604; EP 1316274 A3 20040303

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040904

2004-12-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-11-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI