Global Patent Index - EP 1316277 A2

EP 1316277 A2 2003-06-04 - Front panel for kitchen furniture

Title (en)

Front panel for kitchen furniture

Title (de)

Frontplatte für ein Küchenmöbel

Title (fr)

Panneau avant pour meuble de cuisine

Publication

EP 1316277 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02023268 A

Priority

DE 20119390 U

Abstract (en)

Glass fronts for kitchen unit, e.g. for doors and drawer fronts, have a simplified construction with the glass panes glued into recess strips of adjacent horizontal frames. The glass panes are laid on top of the vertical edge strips with their edges flush with the edges of the frames. The adhesive is applied in strips along the top and bottom edges of the glass panes. The shaping of the stepped profiles leaves a small gap under the glass panes for cleaning.

Abstract (de)

Eine Frontplatte für ein Küchenmöbel, mit einem aus Rahmenteilen (3, 4) zusammengesetzten Rahmen und einer Glasscheibe (5), ist so ausgestaltet, daß die Glasscheibe (5) ausschließlich von zwei sich gegenüber liegenden, parallel und mit Abstand zueinander verlaufenden Rahmenteilen (3) gehalten ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 96/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/20 (2006.01); E06B 5/00 (2006.01); E06B 3/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/201 (2013.01); A47B 96/206 (2013.01); E06B 5/006 (2013.01); E06B 3/7003 (2013.01); E06B 2003/7049 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 29913001 U1 19991021 - RATIONAL EINBAUKUECHEN GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20119390 U1 20020214; EP 1316277 A2 20030604; EP 1316277 A3 20040317

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040918

2005-01-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-12-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI