Global Patent Index - EP 1316285 A1

EP 1316285 A1 2003-06-04 - Dishwashing machine with extractable functional unit

Title (en)

Dishwashing machine with extractable functional unit

Title (de)

Spülmaschine mit herausziehbarer Funktionseinheit

Title (fr)

Lave-vaisselle comprennant unité fonctionnelle extractible

Publication

EP 1316285 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02015298 A

Priority

IT PN20010056 A

Abstract (en)

Dishwashing machine with a functional unit (2, 3) capable of sliding into a pulled-out, ie. extracted position, in which a dripping partition wall (8) extends transversally across the washing vessel (1) of the machine, thereby dividing it into separate compartments (9, 10). When the functional unit slides back into its retracted closed position, the wall (8) shrinks into a compact retracted condition enabling the compartments (9, 10) to fully communicate with each other again. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/0084 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316285 A1 20030604; IT PN20010056 A1 20030227

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090603

2008-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080505

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031014

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI