Global Patent Index - EP 1316286 A2

EP 1316286 A2 2003-06-04 - System for metering a solid detergent

Title (en)

System for metering a solid detergent

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Dosieren von festen Reinigungsmitteln

Title (fr)

Dispositif de dosage d'un detergent solide

Publication

EP 1316286 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02020717 A

Priority

DE 10158605 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has a holding chamber for the cleaning material (2) in which the cleaning material is pressed against a stop (4) and a movable blade (5) near the stop with which part of the cleaning material is cut off and fed to a working chamber (6) of the cleaning machine. The material can be pressed against the stop by an elastic element (7).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung (1) zum Dosieren von festem Reinigungsmittel (2) in einer Reinigungsmaschine. Um eine Bevorratung des Reinigungsmittels in der Reinigungsmaschine zu ermöglichen, ist erfindungsgemäß vorgesehen, dass die Vorrichtung eine Aufnahmekammer (3) für das Reinigungsmittel (2) aufweist, in der das Reinigungsmittel (2) gegen einen Anschlag (4) gedrückt wird, und dass im Bereich des Anschlags (4) eine bewegbare Schneide (5) angeordnet ist, mit der Teile des Reinigungsmittels (2) abgeschnitten und einem Arbeitsraum (6) der Reinigungsmaschine zuführt werden können. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/44 (2006.01); D06F 39/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4463 (2013.01); D06F 39/026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316286 A2 20030604; EP 1316286 A3 20050112; DE 10158605 A1 20030612

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050929

2005-09-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2005-06-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041201

2005-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2005-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI