Global Patent Index - EP 1316333 A1

EP 1316333 A1 2003-06-04 - Boule comprising motifs on its exterior surface

Title (en)

Boule comprising motifs on its exterior surface

Title (de)

Spielkugel mit Markierungen an dessen Aussenoberfläche

Title (fr)

Boule pour jeux de boules comportant des motifs sur sa face externe

Publication

EP 1316333 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02292959 A

Priority

FR 0115551 A

Abstract (en)

The bowling ball (1) has outer surface motifs (4) which have their outer edges in the form of broken lines, except at the poles (2) and an equatorial band (3). The motifs are made in the form of interrupted grooves that are distributed evenly over the ball's outer surface with one end of each groove close to a pole and the other near the equator, and extending along meridionally lines. The polar ends of the grooves can be connected to a ring (5) containing a logo (6), from which they taper towards the equatorial ends.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention est relative à une boule (1) pour jeux de boules du type comportant sur sa face externe des motifs (4) dont les bords forment des lignes essentiellement brisées, sauf au niveau des pôles (2) et d'une bande équatoriale (3), qui empêchent en conséquence la propagation des ondes de choc. La boule selon l'invention est caractérisée en ce que lesdits motifs sont constitués par des rainures (4) interrompues régulièrement réparties sur la surface externe de chaque hémisphère nord et sud de ladite boule (1), les premières extrémités desdites rainures étant situées au voisinage d'un desdits pôles (2) et les secondes extrémités étant situées au voisinage de ladite bande équatoriale (3). Applicable aux boules utilisées pour la pétanque, le jeu provençal, la longue et la lyonnaise. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 37/0098 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316333 A1 20030604; FR 2832935 A1 20030606; FR 2832935 B1 20070209

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130301

2010-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100913

2009-08-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LA SOCIETE KTK

2009-03-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BERBERIAN, VARTAN

2009-03-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MORACCHINI, FRANCOIS-XAVIER

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VARTAN BERBERIAN

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021211

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI