Global Patent Index - EP 1316340 A2

EP 1316340 A2 2003-06-04 - Method for waxing a ski, and a waxing product

Title (en)

Method for waxing a ski, and a waxing product

Title (de)

Skiwachsverfahren und ein Wachsprodukt

Title (fr)

Procédé de fartage des skis et produit de fartage

Publication

EP 1316340 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02396177 A

Priority

FI 20012341 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a method for waxing a ski. The waxing is done by using a band-like multi-layer waxing product (1) comprising a paper-like band material layer (3) and a waxing material layer (4,5), and the ski is waxed by placing the band-like waxing product (1) against the ski bottom (6) so that the waxing material layer (4,5) of the product lies against the ski bottom, and the waxing material layer is transferred and adhered to the ski bottom by heating the waxing product and the ski bottom by means of a heat source (7) placed against the band material layer (3) of the waxing product. According to the invention, the waxing product has a special coating layer (2) over the paper-like band material layer (3) and at least two waxing material layers (4,5) arranged over the special coating layer; a glide waxing material layer and a basic waxing material layer, which layers contain exactly predetermined quantities of waxing material, and, after the application of heat, the band material and special coating layers (2,3) are removed together by tearing them off from the waxing material layers (4,5) adhering to the ski bottom (6). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 11/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316340 A2 20030604; EP 1316340 A3 20040102; FI 115896 B 20050815; FI 20012341 A0 20011129; FI 20012341 A 20030530

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060601

2004-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI