Global Patent Index - EP 1316370 A2

EP 1316370 A2 2003-06-04 - Roll arrangement

Title (en)

Roll arrangement

Title (de)

Walzenanordnung

Title (fr)

Agencement de cylindres

Publication

EP 1316370 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02024781 A

Priority

DE 10159155 A

Abstract (en)

Roller assembly (1), for rolling a metal profile (2) has a roller shaft (3) with a fixed roller ring (4) shrunk on to the shaft, and a second roller ring (5) which can be positioned axially to set the roller width (B) on the shaft. Hydraulic piston/cylinder unit (6) in roller shaft generates hydraulic force to separate roller rings, and a second piston/cylinder unit (7) pushes the rings together. <??>The first piston/cylinder unit has a larger working surface. Drillings (8-12) deliver the hydraulic oil to the piston/cylinder units from a supply source.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Walzenanordnung (1), insbesondere zum Walzen eines Profils (2) aus Metall, die aufweist: eine Walzenwelle (3), einen ersten Walzring (4), der fest auf der Walzenwelle (3) angeordnet ist, und einen zweiten Walzring (5), der zur Einstellung einer gewünschten Walzbreite (B) auf der Walzenwelle (3) axial positionierbar ist. Zur einfachen Einstellung der Walzbreite weist die Walzenanordnung eine erste hydraulische Kolben-Zylinder-Einheit (6), die in der Walzenwelle (3) angeordnet ist, mit der eine hydraulische Kraft erzeugt werden kann, die den ersten Walzring (4) von dem zweiten Walzring (5) weg bewegt, und eine zweite hydraulische Kolben-Zylinder-Einheit (7) auf, die in der Walzenwelle (3) angeordnet ist, und eine hydraulische Kraft erzeugt, die den ersten Walzring (4) auf den zweiten Walzring (5) zu bewegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 27/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 27/02 (2006.01); B21B 1/08 (2006.01); B21B 27/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 27/028 (2013.01); B21B 1/0886 (2013.01); B21B 27/03 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316370 A2 20030604; EP 1316370 A3 20050928; DE 10159155 A1 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BULERT, SIEGMUND

2014-01-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DIEL, HARTMUT

2014-01-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LEMKE, JUERGEN, DR.

2014-01-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: INGELHORST, WOLFGANG

2007-01-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2006-12-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060407

2006-06-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2005-09-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2005-09-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI