Global Patent Index - EP 1316397 A2

EP 1316397 A2 2003-06-04 - Apparatus for manufacturing wood chips

Title (en)

Apparatus for manufacturing wood chips

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Erzeugen von Hackschnitzeln aus Holz

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la fabrication de coupeaux de bois

Publication

EP 1316397 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02022200 A

Priority

  • DE 10159681 A
  • DE 10160034 A

Abstract (en)

Device for producing chips (12) from wood (10) comprises a knife (16) which is guided through the wood in a determined direction (22). The knife is screwed using a screw (50a) which partially penetrates the knife and the knife holder (30a) between an upper side of the knife holder and the lower side of a washer (40a). The screw is screwed with its threaded section into the washer. <??>Preferred Features: The screw has a head (52a) arranged in a recess of the knife holder. The washer is provided with a guiding surface on the side facing the chips.

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung dient zum Erzeugen von Hackschnitzeln (12) aus Holz (10). Sie weist ein in vorbestimmter Richtung (22) durch das Holz (10) geführtes Messer (16) auf, das zwischen einer Oberseite (32) eines Messerhalters (30a) und einer Unterseite (38) einer Unterlegscheibe (40a) in jeweils flächiger Anlage verschraubt ist. Hierzu dient eine die Unterlegscheibe (40a), das Messer (16) und den Messerhalter (30a) wenigstens teilweise durchdringende Schraube (50a), die einen Gewindeabschnitt (56a) aufweist. Der mittels des Messers (16) vom Holz (10) abgetrennte Hackschnitzel (12) wird ferner an der Unterlegscheibe (40a) vorbei geführt. Die Schraube (50a) ist mit ihrem Gewindeabschnitt (56a) in der Unterlegscheibe (40a) verschraubt (Fig. 2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27L 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27L 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27L 11/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316397 A2 20030604; EP 1316397 A3 20071107

INPADOC legal status


2010-09-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100309

2009-12-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091029

2008-07-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2008-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080306

2007-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2007-11-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ESTERER WD GMBH & CO.

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI