Global Patent Index - EP 1316398 A2

EP 1316398 A2 2003-06-04 - Method for making panels covered with thin slices of stony material

Title (en)

Method for making panels covered with thin slices of stony material

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Platten die mit dünnen Scheiben aus steinartigem Material überzogen sind

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication de panneaux recouverts de tranches minces de matériau pierreux

Publication

EP 1316398 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02025907 A

Priority

IT SV20010046 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to an apparatus for cutting stones, such as marbles, granites or the like, and particularly for cutting thin slabs or slices from thicker slabs (3), comprising at least one cutting device (7, 8) having at least one endless flexible diamond impregnated tool (8). In the apparatus of the invention, said cutting device (7, 8) is oriented along a horizontal or substantially horizontal cutting plane, the slab to be cut (3) being itself oriented along a horizontal plane, and there being provided means (4) for relative displacement of the cutting device (7, 8) and the slab (3) to be sliced in the forward cutting direction into the slab (3). The invention also relates to a method for making laminate panels having at least one substrate layer and at least one covering layer joined together, the covering layer consisting of a thin slab or slice made of a stony material, and fabricated by the apparatus of the invention. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28D 1/08; B28D 1/00; B28D 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28D 1/00 (2006.01); B28D 1/08 (2006.01); B28D 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28D 1/005 (2013.01); B28D 1/00 (2013.01); B28D 1/08 (2013.01); B28D 1/124 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR PT TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316398 A2 20030604; EP 1316398 A3 20040728; EP 1316398 B1 20071024; DE 60223122 D1 20071206; DE 60223122 T2 20080731; ES 2292675 T3 20080316; IT SV20010046 A1 20030530

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141121

2015-12-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20151229

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60223122

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131016

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131024

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071024

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080808

2008-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080725

2008-08-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2008-05-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080324

2008-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2292675 T3

2007-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60223122 P 20071206

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR PT TR

2007-05-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR MAKING PANELS COVERED WITH THIN SLICES OF STONY MATERIAL

2005-04-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR PT TR

2004-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI