Global Patent Index - EP 1316423 A1

EP 1316423 A1 2003-06-04 - Engraved roller and method for its production and reprocessing

Title (en)

Engraved roller and method for its production and reprocessing

Title (de)

Rasterwalze und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und Wiederaufbereitung

Title (fr)

Rouleau tramé et méthode pour sa production et retraitement

Publication

EP 1316423 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01128288 A

Priority

EP 01128288 A

Abstract (en)

Production of a screen roller (26), especially for flexographic printing machines, consisting of a cylindrical core (10) with a removable sleeve (18) having on its surface a screen layer (22) with a cup pattern (24) comprises initially attaching the sleeve to the core followed by formation of the pattern layer on the sleeve. <??>Independent claims are also included for a screen roller, and for a process for re-processing a screen roller. Preferred Features: The sleeve axially slides onto the core and is then temporarily expanded by compressed air leaving the core via openings in its peripheral surface.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Rasterwalze (26), insbesondere für Flexodruckmaschinen, mit einem zylindrischen Kern (10) und einem lösbar auf dem Kern gehaltenen Sleeve (18), das an seiner Oberfläche eine Rasterschicht (22) mit einem Näpfchenraster (24) aufweist, dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß zunächst das Sleeve (18) auf dem Kern (10) angebracht wird und erst dann die Rasterschicht (22) auf dem Sleeve (18) ausgebildet wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/26 (2013.01); B41C 1/05 (2013.01); B41N 7/06 (2013.01); B41N 2207/02 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49549 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49558 (2013.01); Y10T 29/4956 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49563 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316423 A1 20030604; EP 1316423 B1 20060125; DE 50108789 D1 20060413; ES 2252137 T3 20060516; US 2003134732 A1 20030717; US 6915569 B2 20050712

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2015-05-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150504

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-09-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50108789

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121117

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121212

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101124

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060125

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070316

2007-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061026

2006-08-23 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20060125

2006-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2252137 T3

2006-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50108789 P 20060413

2006-01-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-01-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-01-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060125

2006-01-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060125

2004-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041116

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030717

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI