Global Patent Index - EP 1316497 A2

EP 1316497 A2 2003-06-04 - Prefabricated wooden deck, boat using the same and method for the attachment of a prefabricated wooden deck

Title (en)

Prefabricated wooden deck, boat using the same and method for the attachment of a prefabricated wooden deck

Title (de)

Fertigholzdeck, Boot mit Fertigholzdeck und Verfahren zur Befestigung eines Fertigholzdecks

Title (fr)

Pont de bois préfabriqué, bateau avec un tel pont et méthode pour fixer un pont de bois préfabriqué

Publication

EP 1316497 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02026296 A

Priority

DE 10158183 A

Abstract (en)

A prefabricated wooden deck (01) for direct or indirect attachment to a boat superstructure (02) comprises a carrier plate (03) which on its side facing the boat superstructure is provided with at least one suction channel. <??>Independent claims are also included for the following: <??>(1) a boat with prefabricated deck; <??>(2) method for installing prefabricated wooden deck; and <??>(3) joint strip.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Holzdeck (01) zur Anordnung auf einem Bootsdeck (02) mit einzelnen, die Oberseite des Holzdecks (01) bildenden Holzleisten (04), die keinen unmittelbaren Kontakt miteinander haben und über ein Dehnungsfugenmaterial (05) miteinander verbunden sind, wobei das Holzdeck (01) einen zumindest zweischichtigen Aufbau aufweist, mit einer im Wesentlichen von den Holzleisten (04) gebildeten Deckschicht und einer von zumindest einer Trägerplatte (03) gebildeten Trägerschicht, wobei die Trägerplatte (03) auf dem Bootsdeck (02) mittelbar oder unmittelbar befestigbar ist. Die Trägerplatte (03) weist auf der zum Bootsdeck (02) gerichteten Seite zumindest einen Absaugkanal (06) auf. Zur Abdichtung der Kleberfuge ist ein Dichtband (11) vorgesehen und die Randfuge (13) wird mit einem Fugenband (14) ausgefüllt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 5/06; B63B 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 5/06 (2006.01); B63B 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 5/10 (2013.01); B63B 5/06 (2013.01); B63B 5/065 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316497 A2 20030604; EP 1316497 A3 20051012; DE 10158183 A1 20030612; DE 10158183 C2 20031016; EP 2088072 A2 20090812; EP 2088073 A2 20090812

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100602

2009-05-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20081126

2006-06-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2006-01-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20051111

2005-10-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2005-10-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI