Global Patent Index - EP 1316500 A2

EP 1316500 A2 2003-06-04 - Outboard motor

Title (en)

Outboard motor

Title (de)

Aussenbordmotor

Title (fr)

Moteur hors-bord

Publication

EP 1316500 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02026473 A

Priority

  • JP 2001365060 A
  • JP 2002002903 A
  • JP 2002002945 A
  • JP 2002003037 A

Abstract (en)

An outboard motor comprising an engine having a starter and a fuel tank, wherein the fuel tank has an end secured to a rotational center shaft of the starter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 20/14; F02B 61/04; F02B 75/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 61/04 (2006.01); F02B 75/16 (2006.01); F02B 1/04 (2006.01); F02B 75/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 61/045 (2013.01); F02B 75/16 (2013.01); F02B 1/04 (2013.01); F02B 2075/027 (2013.01); F02B 2275/34 (2013.01); F05C 2201/021 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316500 A2 20030604; EP 1316500 A3 20031029; EP 1316500 B1 20060726

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091127

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091127

2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091127

2010-06-23 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *YAMAHA MARINE K.K.

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081126

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081112

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081125

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20081110

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081103

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070427

2007-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE FR GB IT NL

2006-07-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-07-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060726

2004-08-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-07-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE FR GB IT NL

2004-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040420

2004-05-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: YAMAHA MARINE KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2003-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-10-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-10-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 63H 20/14 A

2003-10-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02B 61/04 B

2003-10-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02B 75/16 B

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI