Global Patent Index - EP 1316512 A1

EP 1316512 A1 2003-06-04 - Device avoiding the side walls buckling of semi-rigid packages

Title (en)

Device avoiding the side walls buckling of semi-rigid packages

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Vermeiden vom Ausknicken der Seitenwände einer halbstarren Verpackung

Title (fr)

Dispositif évitant le flambage des parois latérales d'emballages en matériau semi-rigide

Publication

EP 1316512 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01403048 A

Priority

EP 01403048 A

Abstract (en)

The packaging comprises two vertical side walls (32,36), upper horizontal walls (40,44,48,52) and lower horizontal walls which are hinged on the vertical walls by upper (12) and lower folding lines. On each of the vertical walls are foldable pieces (58,60) which extend along the folding lines and can be folded inside the packaging when it is subjected to a vertical compression.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un emballage du type comprenant des parois latérales verticales (32, 36), des parois horizontales supérieures (40, 44, 48, 52) et des parois horizontales inférieures qui sont respectivement articulées sur les parois verticales par une ligne de pliage horizontale supérieure (12) et par une ligne de pliage inférieure. Sur chacune desdites parois verticales sont formés des pans pliables (58, 60) s'étendant le long desdites lignes de pliage, lesdits pans étant susceptibles de se plier spontanément vers l'intérieur de l'emballage lorsque celui-ci est soumis à une compression verticale. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 71/00; B65D 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 21/00 (2006.01); B65D 71/00 (2006.01); B65D 71/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/36 (2013.01); B65D 21/00 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00037 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00141 (2013.01); B65D 2571/0066 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00728 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00895 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316512 A1 20030604

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-30 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070420

2007-01-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040113

2004-02-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040113

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-12-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031004

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI