Global Patent Index - EP 1316513 A1

EP 1316513 A1 2003-06-04 - Insert for pressurized liquids container

Title (en)

Insert for pressurized liquids container

Title (de)

Einsatz für unter Druck stehenden Flüssigkeitsbehälter

Title (fr)

Insert pour récipient à liquide sous pression

Publication

EP 1316513 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02026145 A

Priority

DE 20119197 U

Abstract (en)

The container (1) holding an additive is installed in a floating upright position inside a fluid container, and by a piston (6) which moves in the direction of the additive container's axis (x) is divided into a lower chamber (4) with an opening (2) to accommodate the additive (15) and for the dosed delivery of additive into the fluid, and an upper pressure chamber (5) with at least one small external hole (7) to receive the gas volume. The additive container is in the form of a cylinder and has a length which corresponds at least to the clear diameter of the fluid container.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Wirkstoffbehälter (1) mit einer Öffnung zur Aufnahme und zum dosierten Eintrag eines festen, pastösen oder flüssigen Wirkstoffs (15), beispielsweise eines Farb-, Geschmacks- oder eines sonstigen Wirkstoffs, in eine durch ein Gasvolumen (17) unter Überdruck stehende Flüssigkeit (16) eines Flüssigkeitsbehälters (10) zu einem frei wählbaren Zeitpunkt, bestehend aus einer den Wirkstoff (15) enthaltenden Wirkstoffkammer (4) und aus einer ein Gasvolumen (18) enthaltenden Druckkammer (5), wobei durch eine kleine Öffnung in der Druckkammer (5) zwischen den beiden Gasvolumina (17,18) ein Druckausgleich herbeigeführt wird und durch Wegfall des Überdrucks des Gasvolumens (17) des Flüssigkeitsbehälters (10) der Wirkstoff (15) aus dem Wirkstoffbehälter (1) in die umgebende Flüssigkeit (16) durch Absprengen eines Verschlusses eintragbar ist. Der Wirkstoffbehälter (1) ist innerhalb der Flüssigkeit (16) im Flüssigkeitsbehälter (10) aufrecht schwimmend angeordnet und durch einen in Richtung der Wirkstoffbehälterachse (x) parallel verschiebbaren Kolben (6) in eine untere Wirkstoffkammer (4) mit einer Öffnung (2) zur Aufnahme des Wirkstoffs (15) und in eine obere Druckkammer (5) mit zumindest einer kleinen Außenbohrung (7) zur Aufnahme des Gasvolumens (18) aufgeteilt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 79/00; B65D 81/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 79/00 (2006.01); B65D 81/32 (2006.01); B65D 85/73 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/73 (2013.01); B65D 81/3222 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 20119197 U1 20030116; DE 50205866 D1 20060427; EP 1316513 A1 20030604; EP 1316513 B1 20060222

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111125

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111125

2012-09-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50205866

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-08-29 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2012-08-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120731

2012-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111125

2012-06-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120601

2011-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110208

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101006

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110107

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20101220

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-01-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061123

2006-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50205866 P 20060427

2006-03-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-03-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060222

2006-02-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE NL

2006-02-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE NL

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031125

2003-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031014

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI