Global Patent Index - EP 1316516 A1

EP 1316516 A1 2003-06-04 - System for cleaning and refilling of the intermediate space of a double shelled container

Title (en)

System for cleaning and refilling of the intermediate space of a double shelled container

Title (de)

Reinigungs und Auffüllsystem für Zwischenkammer eines doppelwandigen Behälters

Title (fr)

Système de nettoyage et de reremplissage pour l'espace vide d'un récipient à double paroi

Publication

EP 1316516 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02396181 A

Priority

FI 20012368 A

Abstract (en)

This invention provides a system to monitor and detect leaks in the intermediate space (4) between the inner and outer shells (2, 3) of a double-shelled container or pipework, and the apparatus and method by which to clean and refill the intermediate space (4) between the inner and outer shells (2, 3) of a double-shelled container or pipework in order to be able to implement the above-mentioned control system. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 90/50; B08B 9/02; B65D 90/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/02 (2006.01); B65D 90/00 (2006.01); B65D 90/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/0321 (2013.01); B65D 90/00 (2013.01); B65D 90/503 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FI 91625 A

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316516 A1 20030604; FI 115962 B 20050831; FI 20012368 A0 20011203; FI 20012368 A 20030604

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060620

2005-06-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO