Global Patent Index - EP 1316523 A2

EP 1316523 A2 2003-06-04 - Hand type yarn splicing device

Title (en)

Hand type yarn splicing device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum manuellen Verbinden von Fäden

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour épisser des fils a la main

Publication

EP 1316523 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02025648 A

Priority

JP 2001365909 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a hand type yarn splicing device based on a resin joining method that provides a yarn joint having an appropriate length and strength as well as a highly applicable yarn. The hand type yarn splicing device includes clamp members 5, 5' that grip the yarn Y1 and the yarn Y2 to be spliced, cutter members 4, 4' that cut one side of the gripped yarn to expose end surfaces of the yarn, a drive mechanism that moves the clamp members so that the exposed end surfaces of the yarn are abutted against each other, and adhesive supply means 6 for supplying an adhesive to the abutted end surfaces of the yarn (Fig. 2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 69/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 69/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 69/02 (2013.01); B65H 2402/414 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316523 A2 20030604; EP 1316523 A3 20031105; EP 1316523 B1 20070808; CN 1278918 C 20061011; CN 1421372 A 20030604; DE 60221624 D1 20070920; DE 60221624 T2 20080521; JP 2003165675 A 20030610; JP 3968558 B2 20070829

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091119

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081120

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081121

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-07-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080509

2007-09-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60221624 P 20070920

2007-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2005-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041207

2004-07-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2004-06-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040405

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-11-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI