Global Patent Index - EP 1316525 A1

EP 1316525 A1 2003-06-04 - Elevator monitoring system

Title (en)

Elevator monitoring system

Title (de)

Aufzugüberwachungssystem

Title (fr)

Système de surveillance pour ascenseur

Publication

EP 1316525 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02026148 A

Priority

DE 10159074 A

Abstract (en)

The elevator system has an elevator cabin (12) with an emergency call button (22) and connected to a drive mechanism (18) in a drive mechanism room (20) via drive disks (16) and cable pulleys. At least one video camera (24) installed in the cabin for digital video monitoring interacts with a central station (52). The emergency call button is connected to the data memory (28).

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Aufzuganlage (10) mit einer Aufzugkabine (12) beschrieben, die eine Notruftaste (22) aufweist. Zur digitalen Fernüberwachung des Kabineninnenraumes (26) der Aufzugkabine (12) ist in dieser eine Videokamera (24) installiert, die mit einem Datenspeicher (28) der Aufzuganlage (10) wirkverbunden ist. Der Datenspeicher (28), bei dem es sich zweckmäßigerweise um einen überschreibbaren Datenspeicher handelt, ist mit einer entfernten Zentrale (52) wirkverbunden. Die Notruftaste (22) ist mit dem Datenspeicher (28) zusammengeschaltet, um mißbräuchliche Nutzungen bzw. Bedienungen des Aufzuges zu erkennen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/0012 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 5131508 A 19920721 - SUZUKI SHIGEHIKO [JP]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 15 6 April 2001 (2001-04-06)
  • [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 17 5 June 2001 (2001-06-05)
  • [YA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 527 (M - 1484) 22 September 1993 (1993-09-22)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 11 28 November 1997 (1997-11-28)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 16 8 May 2001 (2001-05-08)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316525 A1 20030604; DE 10159074 A1 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031205

2004-04-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI