Global Patent Index - EP 1316526 A1

EP 1316526 A1 2003-06-04 - ELEVATOR DEVICE

Title (en)

ELEVATOR DEVICE

Title (de)

AUFZUGSEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ELEVATEUR

Publication

EP 1316526 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00957005 A

Priority

JP 0006099 W

Abstract (en)

In an elevator apparatus, a corbel portion is disposed on a hoistway wall portion in an uppermost portion of a hoistway by increasing a thickness dimension of the hoistway wall portion inside the hoistway. A mount portion of a machine base on a floor portion of a machine room is disposed directly above the corbel portion such that a load acting on the mount portion is supported by the corbel portion. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 11/04; B66B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/00 (2006.01); E04F 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/004 (2013.01); E04F 17/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316526 A1 20030604; EP 1316526 A4 20080806; CN 1387493 A 20021225; WO 0220388 A1 20020314

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090221

2008-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20081010

2008-08-06 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20080704

2006-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FR LI NL

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020502

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE