Global Patent Index - EP 1316563 A1

EP 1316563 A1 2003-06-04 - Cellulose ethers having delayed dissolution and a process for their production

Title (en)

Cellulose ethers having delayed dissolution and a process for their production

Title (de)

Lösungsverzögerte Celluloseether und ein Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung

Title (fr)

Ethers de cellulose présentant une dissolution retardée et un procédé pour les produire

Publication

EP 1316563 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02025572 A

Priority

DE 10158488 A

Abstract (en)

A process for retardation of water soluble cellulose ethers includes the steps: (a) treatment of moist cellulose ethers with a dialdehyde solution; and (b) drying and comminution of the cellulose ether, with simultaneous addition of an aqueous salt solution to the cellulose ether addition of this together with dissolution of the dialdehyde, with adjustment of the pH of the cellulose ether to 6.0-8.0. Independent claims are also included for the following: (1) retardation of a cellulose ether (CE) obtained as above after a storage time of 2 years with a 15% viscosity decrease; and (2) A retarded cellulose ether with a pH in aqueous solution of 6.0-8.0.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird ein Verfahren zur Herstellung von verzögert wasserlöslichen Celluloseethern, umfassend die Schritte a) Behandlung des feuchten Celluloseethers mit einer Lösung eines Dialdehyds und b) Trocknung und Zerkleinerung des Celluloseethers, dadurch gekennzeichnet, dass gleichzeitig oder zusammen mit der Lösung des Dialdehyds eine wässrige Salzlösung zu dem Celluloseether gegeben wird, wodurch der pH-Wertes des Celluloseethers auf pH 6,0 bis 8,0 homogen eingestellt wird.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08B 11/20; C08B 15/00; C08L 1/26; C08L 1/28; C09J 101/26; C09J 101/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 17/48 (2006.01); C08B 1/00 (2006.01); C08B 11/20 (2006.01); C08B 15/00 (2006.01); C08L 1/26 (2006.01); C08L 1/28 (2006.01); C09J 101/26 (2006.01); C09J 101/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08B 15/005 (2013.01); C08B 11/20 (2013.01); C08L 1/26 (2013.01); C08L 1/28 (2013.01); C08L 1/284 (2013.01); C08L 1/286 (2013.01); C09J 101/26 (2013.01); C09J 101/286 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316563 A1 20030604; EP 1316563 B1 20070207; EP 1316563 B2 20101110; AT 353341 T 20070215; BR 0204862 A 20040615; CA 2412953 A1 20030528; CN 100376600 C 20080326; CN 1421462 A 20030604; DE 10158488 A1 20030612; DE 50209431 D1 20070322; DK 1316563 T3 20070507; DK 1316563 T4 20101213; ES 2281485 T3 20071001; ES 2281485 T5 20110318; HK 1054395 A1 20090529; JP 2003171402 A 20030620; JP 4484426 B2 20100616; KR 100952036 B1 20100407; KR 20030043746 A 20030602; MX PA02011741 A 20050826; RU 2311425 C2 20071127; RU 2311425 C9 20081227; US 2003130500 A1 20030710; US 7012139 B2 20060314

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171115

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171113

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171115

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171108

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171012

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-10-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-10-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131116

2015-05-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150529

2014-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-08-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131115

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131115

2014-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-06-23 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-03-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50209431

- Representative's name: FLEISCHER, ENGELS & PARTNER MBB, PATENTANWAELT, DE

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121212

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121116

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20121113

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20121112

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20121112

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-03-18 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Effective date: 20110308

2011-02-23 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2011-02-22 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2010-12-13 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

2010-11-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2010-11-10 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20101110

2010-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2010-02-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC.

- Effective date: 20091110

2010-01-15 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-11-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20091029 AND 20091104

2009-10-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: WOLFF WALSRODE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20090708

2009-10-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: DOW WOLFF CELLULOSICS GMBH

2009-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070207

2009-09-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC.

- Free text: DOW WOLFF CELLULOSICS GMBH# #29656 WALSRODE (DE) -TRANSFER TO- DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC.#2040 DOW CENTER#MIDLAND, MI 48674 (US)

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081115

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071115

2009-08-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC.

- Effective date: 20090527

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070207

2009-05-27 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC.

2009-01-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070207

2008-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SE TYLOSE GMBH & CO.KG

2008-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA

2008-08-08 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-08-08 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2008-08-08 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-07-09 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SE TYLOSE GMBH & CO.KG

- Effective date: 20071106

2008-07-09 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA

- Effective date: 20071107

2008-07-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: DOW WOLFF CELLULOSICS GMBH

2008-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070508

2008-03-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SE TYLOSE GMBH & CO.KG

2008-03-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

2008-02-29 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: DOW WOLFF CELLULOSICS GMBH

- Free text: WOLFF WALSRODE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT# #29656 WALSRODE (DE) -TRANSFER TO- DOW WOLFF CELLULOSICS GMBH# #29656 WALSRODE (DE)

2008-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20071113

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-02-29 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: WOLFF WALSRODE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Free text: WOLFF CELLULOSICS GMBH & CO.KG# #29656 WALSRODE (DE) -TRANSFER TO- WOLFF WALSRODE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT# #29656 WALSRODE (DE)

2008-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SE TYLOSE GMBH & CO.KG

2008-01-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: DOW WOLFF CELLULOSICS G.M.B.H.AUGUST-WOLFF-STRASSE

- Effective date: 20080116

2008-01-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: DOW WOLFF CELLULOSICS G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20080116

2008-01-02 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070207

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: DOW WOLFF CELLULOSICS G.M.B.H.AUGUST-WOLFF-STRASSE

- Effective date: 20070207

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: DOW WOLFF CELLULOSICS G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20070207

2007-12-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SE TYLOSE GMBH & CO.KG

- Effective date: 20071106

2007-12-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

- Effective date: 20071107

2007-12-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SE TYLOSE GMBH & CO.KG

- Effective date: 20071106

2007-11-24 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070207

2007-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2281485 T3

2007-09-19 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2007-08-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-07-09 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070709

2007-06-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070510

2007-05-08 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20070508

2007-05-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-05-07 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2007-03-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP

2007-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50209431 P 20070322

2007-03-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2007-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2007-02-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-02-07 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070207

2006-03-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WOLFF CELLULOSICS GMBH & CO.KG

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031204

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI