Global Patent Index - EP 1316589 A2

EP 1316589 A2 2003-06-04 - Hydrophobic silica fine powder and its manufacture

Title (en)

Hydrophobic silica fine powder and its manufacture

Title (de)

Feines hydrophobes Kieselsäurepulver und seine Herstellung

Title (fr)

Poudre fine de silice hydrophobe et sa préparation

Publication

EP 1316589 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02258304 A

Priority

JP 2001365554 A

Abstract (en)

A hydrophobic silica fine powder is prepared by premixing a hydrophilic silica fine powder with a dimer diol siloxane or cyclic siloxane as a hydrophobizing agent, mixing them in a ball mill for achieving dispersion and for achieving cleavage or disintegration and consolidation, and thereafter heating at 100-300 DEG C in an ammonia or amine-containing atmosphere. The powder has an aerated bulk density of 100-300 g/l, a specific surface area of 40-300 m<2>/g, a primary particle diameter of 10-120 nm, and a degree of hydrophobization of 40-80 as measured by methanol titration and is less bulky, easy to handle and disperse and stable in a kneaded mixture.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09C 1/30; C01B 33/159; C01B 33/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C01B 33/18 (2006.01); C08K 3/36 (2006.01); C09C 1/28 (2006.01); C09C 1/30 (2006.01); C09C 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B82Y 30/00 (2013.01); C01B 33/18 (2013.01); C09C 1/3081 (2013.01); C01P 2004/62 (2013.01); C01P 2004/64 (2013.01); C01P 2006/10 (2013.01); C01P 2006/12 (2013.01); C01P 2006/90 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316589 A2 20030604; EP 1316589 A3 20031203; EP 1316589 B1 20100120; DE 60235148 D1 20100311; JP 2003171118 A 20030617; JP 3891265 B2 20070314; US 2003103890 A1 20030605; US 2006115405 A1 20060601; US 7332144 B2 20080219

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171129

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171113

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171129

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-11-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20101021

2010-03-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60235148 P 20100311

2010-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2010-01-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070306

2004-08-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040226

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-12-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-12-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 09C 1/30 A

2003-12-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 01B 33/18 B

2003-12-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 01B 33/159 B

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO