Global Patent Index - EP 1316629 A1

EP 1316629 A1 2003-06-04 - Support disk and bearing for a spinning rotor

Title (en)

Support disk and bearing for a spinning rotor

Title (de)

Stützscheibe und Lagerung für einen Spinnrotor

Title (fr)

Disque de support et roulement pour un rotor de filature

Publication

EP 1316629 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02025441 A

Priority

  • DE 10159693 A
  • DE 10237007 A

Abstract (en)

The bearing disk (14), to support the shaft (21) of the rotor in an open-end spinner, has a rim cladding (4) against the rotor shaft. The running surface (41) of the cladding contains additives to inhibit the build-up of dirt and debris. The additives can be a film, varnish or nano-particles of an organic or inorganic material.

Abstract (de)

Für die Lagerung eines Spinnrotors für eine Offenend-Spinnvorrichtung wird eine Stützscheibe vorgeschlagen, bei der die Lauffläche (41) des Laufbelages (4) mit Zusätzen ausgestattet ist, die verhindern, daß sich Schmutz an der Lauffläche (41) des Laufbelages anhaftet. Dafür werden verschiedenartige Zusätze vorgeschlagen, beispielsweise Polytetrafluorethylen. Bei einer anderen Ausgestaltung enthält der Zusatz Nanopartikel, die eine schmutzabweisende Eigenschaft besitzen und darüber hinaus verschleißbeständig sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 4/12; D01H 4/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/10 (2006.01); D01H 4/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/10 (2013.01); D01H 4/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316629 A1 20030604

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050203

2004-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

2003-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030617

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI