Global Patent Index - EP 1316633 A1

EP 1316633 A1 2003-06-04 - BASE FABRIC FOR NON-COATED AIR-BAGS

Title (en)

BASE FABRIC FOR NON-COATED AIR-BAGS

Title (de)

BASISGEWEBE FÜR UNBESCHICHTETE AIRBAGS

Title (fr)

TISSU DE BASE NON ENDUIT POUR AIRBAG

Publication

EP 1316633 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01956923 A

Priority

  • JP 0107064 W
  • JP 2000248028 A
  • JP 2001028886 A
  • JP 2001102354 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2003008582A1] A base fabric for non-coated air bags, in which both the warp and the weft or either of them comprise synthetic fiber multifilaments of flattened cross-section monofilaments having a degree of flatness of from 1.5 to 8.0 and having a monofilament fineness of at moat 10 dtex and a total fineness of from 200 to 1000 dtex, and which satisfies all the following (1) to (3): (1) its cover factor falls between 1700 and 2200; (2) its air permeability under low pressure, PL, is at most 0.1 cc/cm2/sec; and (3) its air permeability under high pressure, PH, is at most 20 cc/cm2/sec, has high tenacity and low air permeability necessary for air bags and is compactly foldable to save the housing space for it.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 15/00; D01D 5/253

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/253 (2006.01); D03D 1/02 (2006.01); D03D 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 1/02 (2013.01); D01D 5/253 (2013.01); D03D 15/00 (2013.01); D03D 15/0088 (2013.01); D10B 2331/02 (2013.01); D10B 2505/124 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2913 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2973 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2978 (2013.01); Y10T 428/298 (2013.01); Y10T 442/3065 (2015.04); Y10T 442/3114 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

US 2003008582 A1 20030109; CA 2384790 A1 20020221; CN 1318668 C 20070530; CN 1388842 A 20030101; DE 60138761 D1 20090702; EP 1316633 A1 20030604; EP 1316633 A4 20060726; EP 1316633 B1 20090520; TW I230213 B 20050401; WO 0214590 A1 20020221

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170714

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170808

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170816

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170712

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100223

2009-07-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60138761 P 20090702

2009-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2009-05-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-07-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: BASE FABRIC FOR NON-COATED AIR-BAGS

2007-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070403

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070403

2006-07-26 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060626

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030218

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR