Global Patent Index - EP 1316641 A1

EP 1316641 A1 2003-06-04 - Press section

Title (en)

Press section

Title (de)

Pressenpartie

Title (fr)

Section de pressage

Publication

EP 1316641 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02016712 A

Priority

DE 10159115 A

Abstract (en)

The press section to extract water from a wet web (1), e.g. of paper or cardboard or tissue, has at least three roller press gaps. A continuous water extraction belt (2-5) passes through each roller press gap, next to the web, to take up the water pressed out of the web. At least one roller (8) forming a press gap has a smooth surface, in contact with the web. The web is carried through at least one roller press gap by a continuous smooth and impermeable transfer belt (6), against the side of the web away from the smooth roller. The roller press gap in front of the gap with the transfer belt is an extended gap, formed by a shoe press roller (11) and a cylindrical counter roller (12). The final smooth press roller is heated, and the web travels onward around a deflection guide roller (14) and suction unit (16), with a transfer belt (15), to the first drying cylinder (13) of the drying section.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Pressenpartie zur Entwässerung einer Papier-, Karton-, Tissue- oder einer anderen Faserstoffbahn (1) mit zumindest drei Pressspalten, wobei durch die Pressspalte neben der Faserstoffbahn (1) wenigstens jeweils ein endlos umlaufendes Entwässerungsband (2,3,4,5) zur Aufnahme des ausgepressten Wassers geführt wird und zumindest eine, an der Bildung eines Pressspaltes beteiligte Presswalze (8) eine glatte Oberfläche aufweist und mit der Faserstoffbahn (1) in Kontakt kommt. Davon ausgehend soll neben einer hohen Entwässerungsleistung auch eine geringe Zweiseitigkeit der Rauhigkeit dadurch erreicht werden, dass die Faserstoffbahn (1) gemeinsam mit einem endlos umlaufenden, glatten Transferband (6) durch wenigstens einen Pressspalt geführt wird, wobei das Transferband (6) mit der, der glatten Presswalze (8) gegenüberliegenden Seite der Faserstoffbahn (1) in Kontakt kommt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/04; D21F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/02 (2006.01); D21F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/045 (2013.01); D21F 3/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1316641 A1 20030604; EP 1316641 B1 20061004; AT 341661 T 20061015; DE 10159115 A1 20030618; DE 50208327 D1 20061116; US 2003101881 A1 20030605; US 6863776 B2 20050308

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130726

2014-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130726

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50208327

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 341661 T

- Effective date: 20130726

2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120726

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120711

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20120711

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100727

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110725

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090715

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-09-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070705

2007-01-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50208327 P 20061116

2006-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI IT SE

2006-10-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061004

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI IT SE

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031204

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI