Global Patent Index - EP 1316642 A1

EP 1316642 A1 2003-06-04 - Calender with a web break control device

Title (en)

Calender with a web break control device

Title (de)

Kalander mit einer Bahnrissüberwachungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Calandre avec un dispositif de contrôle de déchirure de bande

Publication

EP 1316642 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02025844 A

Priority

DE 10158909 A

Abstract (en)

A calendering apparatus has a roll/drum stack composed of at least 2 rolls with nips (6, 8) formed between them and through which a strip is led. A sheet tear monitoring apparatus is included which comprises a strip capturing apparatus (20) which holds the sheet depending on a signal from the strip tear monitoring apparatus connected in series with the calendering apparatus. <??>The sheet capturing apparatus is composed of a pair of clamps (21, 22) which ca be moved together and in their open state, allow the strip to pass through a gap (23) between the beams. The beams preferably have a high grip, optionally plastic, layer on the capturing surface. The strip capturing apparatus preferably has a protective arrangement such as a deflecting plate (31) or blowing jets (32).

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Kalander (1) angegeben mit einem Walzenstapel aus mindestens zwei Walzen (2-5), wobei jeweils zwei Walzen (2-5) einen Nip (6-8) zwischen sich ausbilden, durch den eine Bahn (9) geführt ist, und mit einer dem Kalander vorgeschalteten Bahnrißüberwachungseinrichtung (17-19). Man möchte bei einem Riß der Bahn (9) Markierungen an den Walzen (2, 4) möglichst ausschließen. Hierzu ist vorgesehen, daß vor dem ersten Nip (6) eine Bahnfangeinrichtung (20) angeordnet ist, die in Abhängigkeit von einem Signal der dem Kalander vorgeschalteten Bahnrißüberwachungseinrichtung (17-19) die zulaufende Bahn (9) festhält. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 7/04 (2006.01); D21G 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2013.01); D21F 7/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 10158909 C1 20030417; EP 1316642 A1 20030604; EP 1316642 B1 20050105

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-24 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-11-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061120

2006-11-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061119

2005-12-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051006

2005-11-15 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20051115

- Year of fee payment: 4

2005-11-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20051114

- Year of fee payment: 4

2005-11-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051110

- Year of fee payment: 4

2005-04-26 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50201948 P 20050210

2005-02-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030404

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI